Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04247
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Oct 01, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Global Merchant Cash, Inc., a/k/a Global Merchant Funding, a New York Corporation
Represented By
Global Merchant Cash, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, October 04, 2018
court Minute Entry. Case Dismissed Thu 10/04 11:27 AM
Minute Entry. Final Pretrial Conference Not Held - Case Dismissed. Related [+] (jmaha)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
court Minute Entry Wed 10/03 8:33 AM
Minute Entry. Trial (Continued) Not Held - Case Dismissed 10/1/18. (jjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 10/02 4:30 PM
Minute Entry. Trial not held. Case Dismissed 10/1/18. Related [+] (jmaha)
Related: [-] 24 Order to Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing
Monday, October 01, 2018
70 70 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Mon 10/01 10:51 AM
Order For Dismissal Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #69 Statement of Consent to Entry of Order for Dismissal
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 10/01 10:51 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4247 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/01 10:52 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4247 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
69 69 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/28 4:33 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff, Basil T. Simon and Defendant, Global Merchant Cash, Inc, . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
68 68 audio . Thu 09/27 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/27/2018 2:00:01 PM ]. File Size [ 316 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:19 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 09/27 2:03 PM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled - Hearing Adjourned to allow parties to submit paperwork. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/04/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (jmaha)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order