Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04248
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Apr 16, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
World Global Financing, Inc., a Florida corporation
Represented By
World Global Financing, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
46 46 notice Req to be Removed from Receiving Electronic Filings in a Case Wed 10/03 1:17 PM
Request to be Removed from Receiving Notices of Electronic Filings in a Adversary Case for Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 05/22 8:18 AM
Minute Entry. Trial not held. Case closed. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Thursday, April 26, 2018
court Minute Entry Thu 04/26 10:28 AM
Minute Entry. Final Pre-Trial Conference not held. Case has been closed. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 04/24 8:17 AM
Minute Entry. Case Closed; Trial not held. (Adjourned trial date of 5/22/18 moot) Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Monday, April 16, 2018
45 45 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/16 3:59 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #44 Statement of Consent to Entry of Order for Dismissal
44 44 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/16 11:47 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Dean R. Nelson, Jr. . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 04/16 3:59 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4248 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/16 4:00 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4248 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
43 43 court Copy of Mon 04/09 1:31 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Chapter 7 Trustee To Enter Into SettlementAgreement And Compromise Claim Against World Global Financing, Inc. (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 03/29 3:25 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 04/26/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Friday, March 23, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 03/23 10:52 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Trial date set for 05/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (csiku)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 08, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 03/08 3:03 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 04/26/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 20 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
42 42 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Wed 03/07 1:54 PM
STIPULATED ORDER ADJOURNING FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Related [+] - Final Pre-Trial Conference adjourned to 04/26/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975; Trial date adjourned to 05/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #20 Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order #41 Stipulation to Adjourn
41 41 misc Stipulation Wed 03/07 9:36 AM
Stipulation By and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and World Global Financing, Inc. Re: Entry of Order to Adjourn Final Pre-Trial Conference and Trial . Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
40 40 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/28 1:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] 38 Response to Discovery,39 Response to Discovery
39 39 misc Response to Discovery Thu 12/28 1:42 PM
Response to Discovery Request for Admission Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] 33 Interrogatories
38 38 misc Response to Discovery Thu 12/28 1:40 PM
Response to Discovery Request for Production Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] 33 Interrogatories
Thursday, December 21, 2017
37 37 misc Subpoena Executed Thu 12/21 11:18 AM
Subpoena Executed Served by Sandra DeWitte against Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc. c/o Kennith M. Zorn, Resident Agent on 12/21/17 Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Subpoena Executed Thu 12/21 11:17 AM
Subpoena Executed Served by Sandra DeWitte against Dr. David M. Kent on 12/21/17 Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
35 35 misc Response to Discovery Thu 12/14 11:17 AM
Response to Discovery Plaintiff's Objections And Answers To Defendant's Combined 1) First Set Of Interrogatories, 2) First Request For Production Of Documents, And 3) First Request For Admissions Directed To Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-] 34 Interrogatories, Request for Admissions, Request for Production of Documents
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of Transfers
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - List of Documents Produced
Thursday, November 16, 2017
34 34 misc Interrogatories Thu 11/16 2:31 PM
Interrogatories , Request for Admissions , Request for Production of Documents Basil T. Simon, Trustee Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
33 33 misc Interrogatories Mon 11/13 11:49 AM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's Second Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To World Global Financing, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Statements.Part 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A - Statements.Part 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A - Statements.Part 3
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Statements.Part 4
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Statements.Part 5
Att: 6 Exhibit A - Statements.Part 6
Att: 7 Exhibit A - Statements.Part 7
Att: 8 Exhibit B - Certificate
32 32 order Striking Document (text) Mon 11/13 10:11 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because portions of the PDF are illegible due to the orientation of the page(s) (as to attached exhibits) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Interrogatories31 Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
Friday, November 10, 2017
31 31 misc Interrogatories Fri 11/10 10:59 AM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's Second Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To World Global Financing, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Statements Part 1
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Statements - Part 2
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Statements Part 3
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Statements Part 4
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Statements Part 5
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex A Statements Part 6
Att: 7 Exhibit A - Statements Part 7
Att: 8 Exhibit B - Certificate
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
30 30 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/01 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Alexsy, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
29 29 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Mon 10/30 4:01 PM
Order Extending Deadlines Set Forth In The Parties' Rule 26(f) Report And Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/29/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (kcm)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulation,20 Scheduling Order
28 28 misc Stipulation Mon 10/30 12:01 PM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Dean R. Nelson, Jr. Re: Extend Deadlines Set Forth In The Parties' Rule 26(f) Report And Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/28 11:31 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] 25 Response to Discovery,26 Response to Discovery
26 26 misc Response to Discovery Thu 09/28 11:22 AM
Response to Discovery Related [+] Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] quest for Production24 Interrogatories
25 25 misc Response to Discovery Thu 09/28 11:21 AM
Response to Discovery Related [+] Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] quest for Admissions24 Interrogatories
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
24 24 misc Interrogatories Tue 08/15 12:46 PM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To World Global Financing, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/11 5:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-] 22 Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
22 22 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Fri 08/11 4:59 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
21 21 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Thu 08/03 11:29 AM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/21 2:27 PM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/8/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. Trial date set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
19 19 audio . Thu 07/20 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/20/2017 2:14:01 PM ]. File Size [ 272 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:08 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Thu 07/20 3:22 PM
Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held. Final Pre Trial Conference to be held on 02/08/2018 at 2:00 p.m.; Trial to be held on 03/23/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Friday, July 14, 2017
18 18 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 07/14 10:01 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 06/29 2:33 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 07/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
17 17 order Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing Wed 06/07 12:57 PM
Order Adjourning Initial Scheduling Conference Related [+] - Initial Scheduling Conference adjourned to 07/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.15 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference No.16 Stipulation to Adjourn
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 06/07 11:00 AM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Charles J. Taunt Re: Adjourning Scheduling Conference . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
15 15 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Mon 06/05 2:01 PM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference - Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/29/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/02 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc. Related [+]. (Taunt, Charles)
Related: [-] 12 Answer to Complaint,13 Statement of Corporate Ownership
13 13 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 06/02 4:24 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Taunt, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/02 4:13 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by World Global Financing, Inc.. (Taunt, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
11 11 order Reopen Adversary Wed 05/24 11:59 AM
Order Setting Aside Default Judgment And Entry of Default Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No. 10 Stipulation filed in Adversary Proceeding No. 17-04248
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 05/23 12:52 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: For Order Setting Aside Default Judgment and Entry of Default . Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/23 12:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant World Global Financing, Inc.. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/04 10:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
7 7 order Default Judgment Tue 05/02 3:10 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/02 11:42 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/02 3:10 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4248 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/02 3:11 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4248 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/01 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 28, 2017
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/28 1:54 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of World Global Financing, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/12/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on World Global Financing, Inc. 3/28/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/24 12:44 PM
Summons Issued on World Global Financing, Inc. Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/24 12:44 PM
Adversary case 17-04248 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against World Global Financing, Inc.. Receipt Number deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Transfers