Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04249
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Dec 04, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Merchant Funding Services Corp., a New York corporation
Represented By
Merchant Funding Services Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 12/18 10:49 AM
Minute Entry. Trial not held. Case Dismissed on 12/4/2018. Related [+] (jmaha)
Related: [-] 23 Scheduling Order