Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04250
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Jun 26, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Knight Capital Funding, LLC, a limited liabilty company
Represented By
Knight Capital Funding, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
43 43 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Tue 06/26 3:52 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #42 Statement of Consent to Entry of Order for Dismissal
42 42 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/26 1:11 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Mark L. Rhoades, Joel D. Applebaum . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/26 3:52 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4250 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/26 3:53 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4250 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
court Minute Entry. Settled Prior to Hearing Thu 06/14 8:05 AM
Minute Entry. Settled Prior to Hearing. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 40 Order Adjourning Hearing
Friday, June 08, 2018
court Minute Entry. Settled Prior to Hearing Tue 07/03 2:40 PM
Minute Entry. Settled Prior to Hearing. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
41 41 court Copy of Wed 05/30 9:43 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Chapter 7 Trustee to Enter into Settlement Agreement and Compromise Claim Against Knight Capital Funding, LLC (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
40 40 order Adjourning Hearing Thu 05/24 3:30 PM
Order of the Court to Adjourn for Control Purposes Only. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/14/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975.(Murphy, J.)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Thu 05/24 3:29 PM
Minute Entry. Final Pre-Trial Conference not held. A Motion to Compromise has been filed in the bankruptcy case. FPTC is adjourned to 6/14/18 at 2:00 p.m. for Control Purposes only. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Tue 04/03 7:29 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Trial date set for 06/08/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (csiku)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 22, 2018
court Minute Entry Thu 03/22 8:41 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing adjourned. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 5/24/2018 at 2:00 p.m. at Room 1975. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order39 Amended Order Extending Certain Deadlines Set Forth In the Parties Rule 26(f) Report and Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order
Thursday, February 22, 2018
39 39 order Amended Order Thu 02/22 12:01 PM
AMENDED Order Extending Certain Deadlines Set Forth In The Parties' Rule 26(f)Report And Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order (Amended as to dispositive motion filing deadline only) Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #38 Order Extending Certain Deadlines
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
38 38 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Wed 02/21 3:59 PM
ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE PARTIES' RULE 26(f)REPORT AND ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER Related [+] - Final Pretrial Conference adjourned to 05/24/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975; Trial date adjourned to 06/08/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #13 Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order #37 Stipulation to Extend
37 37 misc Stipulation Wed 02/21 9:29 AM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Joel D. Applebaum Re: To Extend Certain Deadlines Set Forth InThe Parties' Rule 26(f) Report And Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 01/23 10:23 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Not Held; Adjourned to 04/03/2018 at 10:00 am Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Friday, January 19, 2018
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/19 3:11 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Defendant, Knight Capital Funding, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admissions, Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC Related [+]. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-] 35 Response to Discovery
35 35 misc Response to Discovery Fri 01/19 2:46 PM
Response to Discovery Defendant, Knight Capital Funding, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admissions, Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/08 10:31 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
court Minute Entry Thu 12/14 11:31 AM
Minute Entry. Final Pre-Trial Conference not Held. Adjourned to 03/22/2018 at 2:00 pm. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order
Friday, November 17, 2017
33 33 misc Interrogatories Fri 11/17 1:21 PM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's Second Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To World Global Financing, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bank Statements
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Third Amendment To Forbearance Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Continuing Security Agreement
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
32 32 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/01 10:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Alexsy, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
31 31 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Mon 10/16 4:35 PM
Order Extending Deadlines Set Forth In The Parties' 26(f) Report and Adversary proceeding Scheduling Order Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/22/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. Trial date set for 4/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (kcm)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation,13 Scheduling Order
30 30 misc Stipulation Mon 10/16 11:11 AM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Joel D. Applebaum Re: Extend Deadlines Set Forth In The Parties' Rule 26(f) Report And Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 4:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC Related [+]. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-] 26 Response to Discovery
28 28 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 10/10 2:44 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant Related [+] - Corrected Proof of Service Due on 10/17/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.26 Response to Discovery filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC
Monday, October 09, 2017
27 27 notice Notice of Withdrawal Mon 10/09 4:48 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC Related [+]. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-] 25 Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents
26 26 misc Response to Discovery Mon 10/09 4:28 PM
Response to Discovery Defendant, Knight Capital Funding, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents in Accordance with the Court's Stipulated Order Dated September 8, 2017 Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Interrogatories Mon 10/09 4:04 PM
Request for Admissions , Interrogatories , Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel) THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN PER PLEADING NUMBER 27 DATED 10/09/17. Modified on 10/10/2017 (Murphy, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
24 24 order stipulated order Fri 09/08 11:52 AM
Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To Knight Capital Funding, LLC Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.23 Stipulation to Extend
Thursday, September 07, 2017
23 23 misc Stipulation Thu 09/07 2:56 PM
Stipulation By and Between Basil T. Simon and Knight Capital Funding Re: Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production of Documents . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/15 3:06 PM
Certificate of Service of Defendant, Knight Capital Funding, LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal Thu 08/10 11:15 AM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-] 15 Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
20 20 order Striking Document (text) Thu 08/10 10:56 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF has been linked to incorrect docket number (withdrawal notice must be linked to the docket number of the PDF being withdrawn - not to an order) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Notice of Withdrawal19 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
19 19 notice Notice of Withdrawal Thu 08/10 10:11 AM
THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN STRICKEN PER ORDER OF THE COURT DATED 08/10/2017. Notice of Withdrawal Relating to Docket No. 15 only Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2017 (J. Laskaska)
Related: [-] 18 Striking Document
18 18 order Striking Document (text) Thu 08/10 9:36 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF does not match the docket text (title on pleading does not match text in body of pleading) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Notice of Withdrawal16 Notice of Withdrawal filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
17 17 misc Interrogatories Wed 08/09 12:34 PM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To Knight Capital Funding, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal Wed 08/09 12:32 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-] 15 Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
15 15 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Wed 08/09 12:22 PM
Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To Knight Capital Funding, LLC Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
14 14 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 07/24 1:44 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/26 11:42 AM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. Trial date set for 1/23/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
12 12 audio . Thu 06/22 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/22/2017 2:00:34 PM ]. File Size [ 830 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:28 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Thu 06/22 2:21 PM
Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held. Final Pre-Trial Conference to be scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 2:00 PM; Trial to be scheduled for 1/23/2018 at 10:00 AM. Scheduling Order to follow. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Monday, June 19, 2017
11 11 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Mon 06/19 11:03 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
10 10 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Wed 05/24 1:50 PM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference - Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/22/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/12 4:06 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: Knight Capital, LLC. Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
8 8 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 05/09 8:47 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing Related [+] Defendant's Statement of Corporate Ownership due on 05/16/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC
Monday, May 08, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/08 3:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Knight Capital Funding, LLC Related [+]. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/08 3:55 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Knight Capital Funding, LLC Filed by Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Applebaum, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
5 5 order stipulated order Fri 04/21 8:21 AM
Order Extending Time For Defendant To Respond To the Adversary Complaint. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 04/20 9:51 AM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Mark L. Rhoades Re: Extending Time For Defendant To Respond To The Adversary Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Knight Capital Funding, LLC 3/28/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/24 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on Knight Capital Funding, LLC Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/24 12:53 PM
Adversary case 17-04250 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against Knight Capital Funding, LLC. Receipt Number deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Future Receivables Sale Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Transfers