Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04254
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Feb 07, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
XL7 Group LLC
300 Delaware Avenue Suite 210-A
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
XL7 Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jay Lucas
880 Third Avenue 18th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Jay Lucas
contact info
Defendant
Lucas Group Inc.
880 Third Avenue 18th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Lucas Group Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
645 Griswold Ste. 3466
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Lawrence J. Acker
contact info
Steven M. Hickey
contact info
Andrew L. Finn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 03/20 11:49 AM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. Final PreTrial Conference/Trial not held. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
41 41 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/07 10:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.40 Stipulation for Entry of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/07 10:59 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4254 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/07 11:00 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4254 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
40 40 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/06 4:40 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 01/26 10:15 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Trial date set for 03/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (csiku)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
39 39 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Tue 01/23 1:27 PM
ORDER FURTHER ADJOURNING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Related [+] - Final Pretrial Conference and Trial dates adjourned to 03/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.32 Order to Adjourn No.38 Stipulation to Adjourn
38 38 misc Stipulation Tue 01/23 12:51 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants Re: entry of Order Further Adjourning Final Pretrial Conference and Trial with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
37 37 court Copy of Tue 01/09 8:04 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Chapter 7 Trustee to Entry Into Settlement Agreement and Compromise Claims Against Lucas Group, Inc., Jay Lucas and XL7 Group, LLC (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Tue 12/12 8:43 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Trial date set for 01/26/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (csiku)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 07, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK) Thu 12/07 11:13 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 01/26/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
36 36 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Tue 12/05 1:07 PM
ORDER FURTHER ADJOURNING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Related [+] - Final Pretrial Conference adjourned to 01/26/2018 at 10:00AM at Courtroom 1925. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.32 Order to Adjourn No.35 Stipulation to Adjourn
35 35 misc Stipulation Tue 12/05 10:37 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants Re: entry of Order Further Adjourning Final Pretrial Conference with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Striking Document (text) Tue 12/05 10:25 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF does not match the docket text (as to title of PDF) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Stipulation33 Stipulation filed by Defendant XL7 Group LLC, Defendant Jay Lucas, Defendant Lucas Group Inc.
Monday, December 04, 2017
33 33 misc Stipulation Mon 12/04 5:00 PM
THIS PLEADING HAS BEEN STRICKEN PER ORDER OF THE COURT DATED 12/05/17. Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants Re: entry of Order Further Adjourning Final Pretrial Conference with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot) Modified on 12/5/2017 (Murphy, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
32 32 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Thu 11/30 11:59 AM
ORDER ADJOURNING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Related [+] - Final Pretrial Conference adjourned to 12/07/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975; Trial date adjourned to 01/26/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1925. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.30 Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order No.31 Stipulation to Adjourn
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 11/30 3:32 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 30 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
31 31 misc Stipulation Wed 11/29 8:03 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants Re: ENTRY OF ORDER ADJOURNING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
30 30 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/04 12:58 PM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975; Trial date set for 12/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
29 29 audio . Thu 08/03 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/3/2017 2:04:44 PM ]. File Size [ 588 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:27 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Fri 08/04 9:59 AM
Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held. Final Pre-Trial Conference to be scheduled for 11/30/2017; Trial to be scheduled for 12/12/2017. Scheduling Order to follow Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
28 28 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Wed 08/02 3:29 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Acker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
27 27 order Striking Document (text) Wed 07/26 10:52 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF does not match the docket text/Incorrect event has been used Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Affirmative Defenses26 Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
Friday, July 21, 2017
26 26 misc Affirmative Defenses Fri 07/21 11:13 AM
Affirmative Defenses Responses Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Acker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
court Minute Entry Thu 07/20 11:22 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned to 08/03/2017 at 2:00 p.m. Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
25 25 order Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing Wed 07/19 4:21 PM
Order Adjourning Initial Scheduling Conference Related [+] - Initial Scheduling Conference adjourned to 08/03/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.23 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference No.24 Stipulation to Adjourn
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 07/19 2:59 PM
Stipulation By and Between All parties Re: Scheduling Conference Adjournment . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Acker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
23 23 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Wed 06/14 10:20 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference - Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 07/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
22 22 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 06/13 11:57 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendants Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC Related [+]. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-] 21 Deficiency Notice
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
21 21 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Wed 06/07 8:43 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing Related [+] - Defendants' Statement of Corporate Ownership due on 06/14/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.20 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants XL7 Group LLC, Jay Lucas and Lucas Group Inc.
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/06 3:21 PM
Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service Filed by Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Bullock, Charles)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/06 8:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 8:00 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC Related [+]. (Bullock, Charles)
Related: [-] 17 Order to Reopen Adversary Case
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
17 17 order Reopen Adversary Tue 05/16 1:41 PM
Order Granting Stipulation To Reopen Adversary Proceeding, And To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Dkt. No. 16 Stipulation filed in Adversary Proceeding No. 17-04254
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 05/16 12:22 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff, by and through his Counsel, Hickey, Cianciolo, Finn & Atkins, P.C. and Defendants, by and through their Counsel, Stevenson & Bullock, P.L.C. Re: to Reopen Adversary Proceeding and to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment with proposed Order . Filed by Defendants Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc., XL7 Group LLC. (Bullock, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
15 15 order Default Judgment Tue 05/02 4:58 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]Against Jay Lucas , Lucas Group Inc. , XL7 Group LLC . (Clark, J)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/02 10:01 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to all defendants Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/02 4:58 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4254 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/02 4:59 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4254 Closed. (Clark, J)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/01 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 28, 2017
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/28 1:58 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of all defendants - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/12/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jay Lucas 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 2:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lucas Group Inc. 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 2:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on XL7 Group LLC 3/28/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 2:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on XL7 Group LLC 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Striking Document (text) Wed 03/29 2:42 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: These pleadings are stricken from the record because they are non-compliant - missing case caption Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Summons Service Executed, Summons Service Executed, Summons Service Executed, Summons Service Executed3 Summons Service Executed,4 Summons Service Executed,5 Summons Service Executed,6 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on XL7 Group LLC 3/28/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on XL7 Group LLC 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 11:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on Lucas Group Inc. 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 11:24 AM
Summons Service Executed on Jay Lucas 3/27/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/24 3:32 PM
Summons Issued on XL7 Group LLC Answer Due 04/24/2017; Jay Lucas Answer Due 04/24/2017; Lucas Group Inc. Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/24 3:32 PM
Adversary case 17-04254 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against XL7 Group LLC, Jay Lucas, Lucas Group Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A