Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-45784

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:17-ap-04255
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2017
Terminated:Aug 22, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.
Represented By
Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Anthony J. Kochis
Wolfson Bolton PLLC
contact info
Scott A. Wolfson
Wolfson Bolton PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Wed 05/16 8:44 AM
Minute Entry. Trial Not Held - Case Closed. Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 33 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
court Minute Entry. Case Dismissed Tue 05/08 9:29 AM
Minute Entry. Final Pretrial Conference Not Held - Case Dismissed. Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 33 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
48 48 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/22 1:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.47 Stipulation to Entry of Order
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 08/22 1:36 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4255 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/22 1:37 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4255 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
47 47 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/21 4:44 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff, Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants . Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
46 46 order stipulated order Tue 08/15 9:34 AM
Order Withdrawing Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Third-Party Defendants' Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. No.29 ) Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.45 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion
court Minute Entry Tue 08/15 1:32 PM
Minute Entry.Hearing Not Held - 8/2/17 - Notice of Pending Settlement of Case entered. Related [+] (po )
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Strike Document filed by Gene R. Kohut
Monday, August 14, 2017
45 45 misc Stipulation to Withdraw Motion Pursuant to LBR 9014-1(i) Mon 08/14 3:40 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants to Withdraw Motion Pursuant to LBR 9014-1(i) Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut Related [+]. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 29 Motion To Strike Document(related documents25 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim) Nos. 10 through 17
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
44 44 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/02 10:43 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Tue 07/11 9:55 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 08/15/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1875. (po )
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Strike Document filed by Gene R. Kohut
Friday, July 07, 2017
43 43 order Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing Fri 07/07 3:02 PM
Order Adjourning Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Third-Party Defendant's Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. No.29 ) - Hearing adjourned to 08/15/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1875 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.42 Stipulation to Adjourn
42 42 misc Stipulation Fri 07/07 2:40 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants Re: Entry of Order Adjourning Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Third-Party Defendants' Affirmative Defenses . Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK) Tue 06/20 9:08 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 07/11/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1875. (po )
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Strike Document filed by Gene R. Kohut
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
41 41 order Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing Wed 06/14 9:01 AM
Order Adjourning Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Third-Party Defendants' Affirmative Defenses (Dkt. No.29 ) - Hearing adjourned to 07/11/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1875 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.40 Stipulation to Adjourn
40 40 misc Stipulation Wed 06/14 7:42 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants Re: Order Adjourning Hearing re Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Third-Party Defendants' Affirmative Defenses . Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A
Monday, June 12, 2017
39 39 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/12 4:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut Related [+]. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 38 Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
38 38 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 06/12 4:09 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 06/12 3:57 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor. (Vintevoghel, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service
36 36 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 06/12 3:00 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc., 3rd Party Plaintiff Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
35 35 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 06/02 9:54 AM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 6/20/2017 at 10:30 AM Courtroom 1875 for29 , (O'Hara, Patti)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Strike Document filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut
Thursday, June 01, 2017
34 34 answer Response Thu 06/01 2:42 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor (Vintevoghel, Amanda)
Related: [-] 29 Motion To Strike Document(related documents25 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim) Nos. 10 through 17
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
33 33 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/24 12:23 PM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 05/08/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1875; Trial date set for 05/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1875. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
32 32 audio . Tue 05/23 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/23/2017 2:07:44 PM ]. File Size [ 3996 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:39 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Tue 05/23 2:19 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Scheduling Order to be Issued. Related [+] (po )
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Thursday, May 18, 2017
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 4:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut Related [+]. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 30 Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents
30 30 misc Interrogatories Thu 05/18 4:06 PM
Interrogatories First Set , Request for Production of Documents Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Strike Document Thu 05/18 4:02 PM
Motion To Strike Documen Related [+] Nos. 10 through 17 Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-] 25 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim
28 28 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 05/18 11:08 AM
Answer to Counterclaim asserted by Zachary Taylor et.al. Filed by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
27 27 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Wed 05/10 10:21 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Wolfson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
26 26 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Fri 04/28 2:52 PM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 5/23/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1875. (Maruszewski, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
25 25 answer|cmp Answer to Third Party Complaint|Counterclaim Thu 04/27 4:00 PM
Answer to Third Party Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and , Counterclaim by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor against Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Filed by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor.(Dragich, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service
24 24 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/27 2:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor. (Vintevoghel, Amanda)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/27 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lucy D. Taylor, Lucy D. Taylor, William Zachary Taylor, W. Zachary Taylor. (Dragich, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
22 22 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/11 9:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Lucy D. Taylor 3/29/2017; Lucy D. Taylor 3/29/2017; William Zachary Taylor 3/29/2017; W. Zachary Taylor 3/29/2017 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
21 21 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 04/10 10:02 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant(s) - Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 04/17/2017 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.10 ] Third-Party Complaint
Monday, April 03, 2017
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/03 8:35 AM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
19 19 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lucy D. Taylor Living Trust 3/29/2017; Lucy Taylor 3/29/2017; William Zachary Taylor 3/29/2017; W. Zachary Taylor Living Trust 3/29/2017 (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
18 18 court Third-Party Summons Issued Tue 03/28 3:06 PM
Third-Party Summons Issued on Lucy D. Taylor Living Trust, Lucy Taylor, William Zachary Taylor and W. Zachary Taylor Living Trust. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 03/28 2:53 PM
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 03/28 2:53 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Kevin M. Smith on behalf of Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Exhibit Tue 03/28 11:02 AM
Exhibit A to Third Party Complaint Filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 10 Third-Party Complaint
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/28 10:22 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 13 Lis Pendens
13 13 misc Lis Pendens Tue 03/28 10:21 AM
Lis Pendens Filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/28 9:55 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint
11 11 utility Jury Demand Tue 03/28 9:29 AM
Jury Demand by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Filed by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc., Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 10 Third-Party Complaint
10 10 cmp Third-Party Complaint Tue 03/28 9:27 AM
Third-Party Complaint by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. against Lucy D. Taylor Living Trust, W. Zachary Taylor Living Trust, Lucy Taylor, William Zachary Taylor . (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 03/28 9:21 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service and Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing Related [+] - Proof of Service and Statement of Corporate Ownership due on 04/04/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.5 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 03/28 9:18 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Jury Demand Tue 03/28 9:17 AM
Jury Demand by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Filed by Defendants Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc., Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 misc Affirmative Defenses Tue 03/28 9:16 AM
Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/28 9:15 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/27 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Gene R. Kohut. (Wolfson, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/27 8:20 AM
Summons Service Executed on Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. 3/24/2017 (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 03/24 4:09 PM
Summons Issued on Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc. Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/24 4:09 PM
Adversary case 17-04255 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust against Glennwood Custom Builders, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]