Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:15-bk-45784
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 19, 2015
Terminated:Sep 26, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Nov 24, 2015

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lee Steel Corporation
45525 Grand River Ave.
Novi, MI 48374
Represented By
Jayson Ruff
contact info
Joshua A. Gadharf
contact info
Stephen M. Gross
contact info
Debtor
LSC Liquidation, Inc.
45525 Grand River Ave.
Novi, MI 48374
Represented By
Jayson Ruff
contact info
Joshua A. Gadharf
contact info
Stephen M. Gross
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Scott A. Wolfson
Wolfson Bolton PLLC
contact info
Thomas John Kelly, Jr.
contact info
Anthony J. Kochis
Wolfson Bolton PLLC
contact info
Ryan D. Heilman
contact info
Liquidating Trustee
Gene R. Kohut, Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee for the LSC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Anthony J. Kochis
Wolfson Bolton PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Daniel M. McDermott
Represented By
Sean M. Cowley (UST)
United States Trustee
contact info
Leslie K. Berg (UST)
contact info
Jill M. Gies (UST)
contact info


1. Novi-based Lee Steel Corp. files Chapter 11 bankruptcy (crainsdetroit.com)
Submitted Fri 04/17/2015
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 11/20 8:40 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned 12/04/2018 at 10:30 AM Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 655 Objection to the Closing of Case filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 11/20 11:21 AM
CORRECTED Minute Entry. Case Closed. Related [+] (lmoss)
Related: [-] 655 Objection to the Closing of Case filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors