Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Feb 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
100 First Stamford Place, Suite 700
Stamford, KS 66902
Represented By
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/11 3:25 PM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-5049 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 08/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Judgment
Monday, August 20, 2018
41 41 order Judgment Mon 08/20 4:11 PM
Judgment On The Trustee's KAAPA Preference Claim Signed on 8/20/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 18, 2018
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/18 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment
Thursday, August 16, 2018
39 39 24 pgs order Opinion Thu 08/16 3:16 PM
Order Designated as Opinion Signed on 8/16/2018 - Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment (waa)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Summary Judgment Thu 08/16 3:15 PM
Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment Related [+] Signed on 8/16/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
37 37 notice Service Wed 05/23 2:32 PM
Notice of Service of Supplemental Reply Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Brief Wed 05/23 2:30 PM
Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc.. (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
35 35 misc Brief Wed 05/16 4:17 PM
Opposition Brief, with Certificate of Service. Related [+] Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] sponse to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on New Value 34 Supplemental Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. (RE: related document(s) 32 Order (Generic)).
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
34 34 misc Brief Tue 04/17 11:00 AM
Supplemental Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. Related [+]. (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-] 32 Order (Generic)
Friday, March 16, 2018
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/16 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
32 32 order Generic Wed 03/14 10:52 AM
Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
31 31 misc Brief Wed 01/03 1:49 PM
ReplyBrief, with Certificate of Service. in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of United Rentals (North America), Inc. Related [+] (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-] 21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Thursday, December 21, 2017
30 30 answer Response Thu 12/21 1:12 PM
Opposition Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Att: 1 Appendix
Att: 2 Appendix
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/13 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Sunday, December 10, 2017
28 28 order Extend/Shorten Time Sun 12/10 4:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 12/10/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, December 08, 2017
27 27 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 12/08 2:53 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/29 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Thursday, November 23, 2017
25 25 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 11/24 8:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
24 24 motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 11/22 1:12 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
23 23 notice Service Thu 11/02 3:33 PM
Notice of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support and Appendix, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Support Document Thu 11/02 3:31 PM
Document filed in support of : Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support with Certificate of Service on 11/2/17. Appendix Exhibits 1-7 Filed by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of United Rentals (North America), Inc. Related [+] (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-] 21 Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibits 1 through 3-2
Att: 2 Appendix Exhibits 4 and 5
Att: 3 Appendix Exhibit 6
Att: 4 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 1
Att: 5 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 2
Att: 6 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 3
Att: 7 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 4
Att: 8 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 5
Att: 9 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 6
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Thu 11/02 3:24 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/06 11:00 AM
Agreed Modified Scheduling Order Signed on 9/6/2017 (wed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
19 19 notice Service Tue 07/11 1:20 PM
Notice of Service of Responses to Discovery, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Service Tue 07/11 1:15 PM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
17 17 notice Service Mon 06/12 1:48 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 10, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/10 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 06/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
15 15 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 06/08 4:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Signed on 6/7/2017. (wed)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/06 4:42 PM
Motion for Paul Michael Schrader to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon D. Wead. Fee Amount $50 Filed on behalf of Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc., with Certificate of Service.(Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Tue 06/06 4:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-05049 [motion,mprohac] ( 50.00). Receipt number 13975475,amount $ 50.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
13 13 notice Generic Notice Fri 06/02 1:30 PM
Notice of Service. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
12 12 notice Service Thu 06/01 11:01 AM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
10 10 order Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Wed 05/24 9:16 AM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 5/24/2017 Status Conference to be held on 11/21/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228., if PTO filed by 10/27/17. (wmb)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 05/24 3:51 PM
Hearing NOT Held, 26f report approved prior to hearing Related [+]. (wmb)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05049 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against United Rentals (North America), Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
9 9 misc Report of Parties Planning Meeting Tue 05/16 2:18 PM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
8 8 notice Hearing Wed 05/03 8:56 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by USBC. . (wed)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 05/03 8:57 AM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 150. (wed)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05049 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against United Rentals (North America), Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
7 7 notice Generic Notice Tue 05/02 9:46 AM
Notice of Financial Interest Disclosure Statement. Filed by Defendant United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/02 9:41 AM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by United Rentals (North America), Inc. Related [+]. (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05049 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against United Rentals (North America), Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/02 9:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Shannon D. Wead with Certificate of Service Filed by Shannon D. Wead on behalf of United Rentals (North America), Inc. . (Wead, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/10 11:12 AM
Summons Service Executed on United Rentals (North America), Inc. 4/10/2017 (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 04/07 8:30 AM
Summons Issued on United Rentals (North America), Inc. Date Issued 4/7/2017, Answer Due 5/8/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 04/06 1:20 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis - summons(es) requested on United Rentals (North America), Inc. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/06 1:19 PM
Adversary case 17-05049 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against United Rentals (North America), Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet