Lockeford Rx, Inc. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly administered under 17-32186. This message does not apply to proofs of claims.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-32186
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-32186
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-32230 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lockeford Rx, Inc.
14090 E Highway 88
Lockeford, CA 95237-9541 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate
Wed 08/30 3:44 PM
Certificate / Notice of FIling Certificate of Service by BMC Group, Inc. (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ) (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Schedule E/F
Fri 08/11 5:47 PM
Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Non-Individual , Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities, and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ). (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Fri 06/16 8:37 AM
Declaration re: (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ) (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 06/16 8:36 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ). (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedule A/B
Fri 06/16 8:35 AM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors and Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ). (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/13 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 364. Notice Date 04/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/11 5:05 PM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition, Consolidated 20 Largest Unsecured List and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Lockeford Rx, Inc. ) (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Entry
Mon 04/10 11:46 AM
DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of this case with the chapter 11 cases of Uplift Rx, LLC. The docket in the case of Uplift Rx LLC, Case No. 17-32186 should be consulted for all further documents filed and all matters affecting this case. (ltie) |
|
2 | 2
order
Joint Administration
Mon 04/10 11:06 AM
Order Granting Complex Case Treatment and Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases under Case No. 17-32186 Signed on 4/10/2017. (ltie) |
|
Saturday, April 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
69
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Sat 04/08 11:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Lockeford Rx, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/8/2017 (Green, Elizabeth) |
|
crditcrd
none
Sat 04/08 1:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-32230 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18900493. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |