Uplift Rx, LLC and Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-32186 |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Uplift Rx, LLC
15462 FM 529
Houston, TX 77095 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Alliance Health Networks, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Alliance Medical Administration, Inc.
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Alliance Medical Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Alta Distributors, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Belle Pharmacy, LLC
1100 Jackson St Ste D
Richmond, TX 77469-3320 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Benson Pharmacy, Inc.
18005 Sky Park Cir Ste E
Irvine, CA 92614-6514 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Berkshire Pharmacy, LLC
1812 State Hill Rd
Wyomissing, PA 19610-1604 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Best Rx, LLC
1518 E Main St
Lancaster, OH 43130-3435 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Bridgestone Pharmacy Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Bridgestone Pharmacy, LLC
809 Hamilton Crossing Suite 825-827
Nashville, TN 37013 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Brookhill Pharmacy, LLC
1730 Matthews Township Pkwy Ste A
Matthews, NC 28105-4928 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
BrooksideRx, LLC
11020 Q St
Omaha, NE 68137-3742 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Burbank Pharmacy, LLC
2515 Oneal Ln Ste 1-2
Baton Rouge, LA 70816-3397 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Canyon Medical, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Canyons Pharmacy, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Charleston Rx, LLC
2498 N Pleasantburg Dr
Greenville, SC 29609-2730 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Cheshire Pharmacy, LLC
2441 Cheshire Bridge Rd NE Ste 130
Atlanta, GA 30324-3760 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Conoly Pharmacy, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Cottonwood Pharmacy, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Crestwell Pharmacy Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Delaney Pharmacy, LLC
2573 Richmond Rd Ste 300
Lexington, KY 40509-1710 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Eat Great Cafe, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Galena Pharmacy Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Galena Pharmacy, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Garnett Pharmacy, LLC
2780 Dewey Ave
Greece, NY 14616-4626 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Geneva Pharmacy, LLC
20513 Nicholas Cir Ste 3
Elkhorn, NE 68022-2971 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Geneva Rx Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Glendale Square Rx, Inc.
6583 Atlantic Ave Ste 109
Long Beach, CA 90805-7359 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Goodman Pharmacy, LLC
6888 Goodman Rd Ste 104
Olive Branch, MS 38654-6855 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Hawthorne Pharmacy, LLC
3320 Tylersville Rd
Hamilton, OH 45011-7714 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Hawthorne Rx Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Hazelwood Pharmacy, LLC
10483 Old Olive Street Rd
Creve Coeur, MO 63141-5923 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Health Rx Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Health Saver Rx, LLC
3809 Beam Rd Ste H
Charlotte, NC 28217-2852 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Improve Rx, LLC
47103 Five Mile Rd
Plymouth, MI 48170-2420 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Innovative Rx, LLC
12176 S 1000 E Ste 2
Draper, UT 84020-3221 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Kendall Pharmacy, Inc.
1555 Doolittle Dr Ste 160
San Leandro, CA 94577-2272 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lockeford Rx, Inc.
14090 E Highway 88
Lockeford, CA 95237-9541 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Lone Peak Rx, LLC
11724 S State St Ste 102
Draper, UT 84020-7165 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Medina Pharmacy, LLC
5563 De Zavala Rd Ste 180
San Antonio, TX 78249-1738 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
New Jersey Rx, LLC
125 N Broadway
South Amboy, NJ 08879-1639 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
New Life Pharmacy, LLC
9883 S 500 W
Sandy, UT 84070-2561 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Newton Rx, LLC
55 Mill St Ste 7
Newton, NJ 07860-1457 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Oak Creek Rx, LLC
8607 F St
Omaha, NE 68127-1604 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ohana Rx, LLC
4416 Dewey Ave
Greece, NY 14616-1224 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ollin Pharmaceutical, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
On Track Rx, LLC
2683 Saint Johns Bluff Rd S Ste 127
Jacksonville, FL 32246-3765 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Osceola Clinic Pharmacy, LLC
720 W Oak St Ste 114
Kissimmee, FL 34741-4990 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Philadelphia Pharmacy Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Pinnacle Pharmacy Solutions, LLC
3011 S 52nd St
Tempe, AZ 85282-3216 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Raven Pharmacy Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Raven Pharmacy, LLC
515 Fairmount Ave Ste 130
Towson, MD 21286-8520 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Richardson Pharmacy, LLC
1300 E Arapaho Rd Ste 210
Richardson, TX 75081-2445 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Riverbend Prescription Services, LLC
9875 S 500 W
Sandy, UT 84070-2561 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Riverfront Rx, LLC
19277 Conifer Ln
Council Bluffs, IA 51503-8632 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Skyline Health Services, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Stonybrook Pharmacy, LLC
13921 S Plz
Omaha, NE 68137-2916 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Uinta Rx, LLC
5410 Newport Dr Ste 43
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008-3722 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Waverly Pharmacy, LLC
328 W Main St
Waverly, VA 23890-3235 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Woodward Drugs, LLC
9300 Woodward Ave
Detroit, MI 48202-1633 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Woodward Rx Holdings, LLC
10855 S River Front Pkwy
South Jordan, UT 84095-5762 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2019 10:49 AM CDT |
Attorney
David C. Cimo
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Fox Rothschild LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Powerteam, LLC
718 Washington Ave N Suite 101
Minneapolis, MN 55401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AIC Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AMA Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ASM Capital X LLC
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Express Bank, FSB
PO Box 3001
Malvern, PA 19355 |
|
Creditor
Appletree Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ascensia Diabetes Care
430 south Beiger Street
Mishawaka, IN 46544 |
|
Creditor
Aubrun Pharmaceutical Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Auburn Pharmaceutical Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BluPax Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boston Building LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CFS 19111, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Central Payment Co., LLC
Attn: W. Steven Bryant 600 Congress Avenue, Ste. 2200
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clear Creek Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
EQYInvest Owner II, Ltd., LLP
Rashti and Mitchell 4422 Ridgeside
Dallas, TX 75244 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Express Script, Inc.
21653 Network Place
Chicago, IL 60673 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Greenwerks Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County Municipal Utility District #186
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County Water Control and Improvement District #145
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Highland Wholesale, LLC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kross Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway Ste 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
LifeScan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Merritt Blvd. L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NE-Medical Supply USA, Inc.
621 NW 53rd Street, Ste. 240
Boca Raton, FL 33487 |
|
Creditor
Osborn Companies, LC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PC Venture Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phoenix 2006 Partners
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RA Health Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richardson ISD
500 E. Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
RiverPark Five, LLC
Jackson Walker L.L.P. c/o Bruce J. Ruzinsky 1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roche Diabetes Care, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roche Diagnostics Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deb Secrest
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
Stay Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TMC-3011 S 52nd ST, LLC
Rashti and Mitchell 4422 Ridgeside
Dallas, TX 75244 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tetra Corporate Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The State of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Ultimate Software Group, Inc.
Scott D. Lawrence 2001 Ross Ave., Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TrackVia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Virginia Attoney General's Office
Eastern Panhandle Office 269 Aikens Center
Martinsburg, WV 25403 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Virginia Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wildrose Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ZB, N.A.
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
160 Raritan Center Parkway, Unit 1
Edison, NJ 08837 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Gingrich
|
|
Defendant
Shred-It USA, LLC "Shred-It - IT US JV, LLC"
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
CohnReznick LLP
|
|
Financial Advisor
FTI Consulting, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Alameda Pharmacy, LLC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Baytree Pharmacy, LLC
2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
El Dorado Pharmacy, LLC
2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
William R. Greendyke
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hanover Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mercato Partners
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
UpWell Holding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
BMC Group, Inc
600 1st Avenue, Suite 203
Seattle, WA 98104 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Cimo Mazer Mark PLLC
|
|
Trustee
Ronald L Glass
GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group LLC 3445 Peachtree Rd Ste 1225
Atlanta, GA 30326 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Creditor
ARI University Heights, LLC
Terminated: 08/13/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Alliance Medical Holdings files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy following criminal investigation (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
1499 | 1499
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 9/30/2024 (Filed By Michael Foreman ). (Newcomer, Joshua) |
|
1498 | 1498
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 6/30/2024 (Filed By Michael Foreman ). (Newcomer, Joshua) |
|
1497 | 1497
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 3/31/2024 (Filed By Michael Foreman ). (Newcomer, Joshua) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/18 8:57 AM
Joint Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3936 Closed. (SierraThomasAnderson) |