Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-10772
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Dec 20, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CIBER, Inc.
6312 South Fiddler's Green Circle Suite 600E
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
Represented By
Jarrett Vine
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Justin K. Edelson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Dipesh Patel
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Brett H. Miller
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Sharon L. Levine
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Benjamin Butterfield
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Daniel J Harris
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Todd M. Goren
Morrison Foerster
contact info
Dennis L. Jenkins
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Steve Rappoport
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 2:48 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
Hain Capital Group, LLC
301 Route 17 North 7th Floor
Rutherford, NJ 07070
Creditor
Level 3 Communications, LLC
1025 Eldorado Boulevard
Broomfield, CO 80021
Represented By
Gregory T. Donilon
Pinckney, Weidinger, Urban & Joyce LLC
contact info
Creditor
International Business Machines Corp (IBM)
Creditor
Lansing Board of Water and Light
Represented By
Ronald A Spinner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone PLC
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Stephen S. LaPlante
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Lincoln Orlando Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Creditor
LinkedIn Corporation
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 4th Ave Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
Jami B. Nimeroff
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Maria Ann Milano
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Louisiana Department of Health
c/0 Steven E Adams, Attorney 4845 Jamestown Ave Suite 204
Baton Rouge, LA 70808
Represented By
Steven Edward Adams
Adams Law Office, Ap
contact info
Creditor
Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services
651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Magnozzi & Kye, LLP
contact info
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis 824 N. Market Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Richard A. Barkasy
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pioneer Funding Group LLC
Greeley Square Station PO Box 20188
New York, NY 10001
Creditor
Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
Savvis Communications Corp. d/b/a CenturyLink TS
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Marcy M. Heronimus
contact info
Creditor
Sonar Asset Management Group, Inc.
80 Business Park Drive Suite 208
Armonk, NY 10504
Creditor
State of Washington
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Zachary Mosner
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP 2600 One Commerce Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Michael J. Cordone
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young LLP
contact info
Joelle E. Polesky
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
555 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Courtney J. Hull P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Courtney J Hull
C/o Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
The Boston Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel N. Brogan
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Richard M. Kremen
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Jeremy M. Downs
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
contact info
Jacob H. Marshall
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
contact info
Justin Cory Falgowski
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Amtex Enterprises, Inc.
2775 Park Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95050
Represented By
David Blaise Rao
Binder & Malter LLP
contact info
Creditor
B.E. Capital Management Fund LP
228 Park Ave S #63787
New York, NY 10003
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 West 37th Street, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Matthew A. Gold
Argo Partners Inc.
contact info
Creditor
Cedar Glade LP
767 Fifth Avenue 19th Floor
New York, NY 10153
Represented By
Robert K. Minkoff
contact info
Creditor
CenturyLink Communications, LLC f/k/a Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Represented By
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Chubb Companies
Represented By
Richard W. Riley
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Philadelphia
Law Revenue Bureau c/o Megan N. Harper Municipal Services Building 1401 John F. Kennedy Blvd, 5th floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Megan N. Harper
City Of Philadelphia Law/revenue Dept.
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
Dell Marketing, L.P.
811 Barton Springs Road Suite 811
Austin, TX 78704
Represented By
Sabrina L. Streusand
Streusand, Landon & Ozburn, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Department of Labor and Industry
651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
101 South Tryon, LP
Attn: Mark H. Ralston, Esq. 700 Three Galleria Tower 13155 Noel Road, L.B. 13
Dallas, TX 75240
Represented By
Mark H. Ralston
Fishman Jackson
contact info
John D. McLaughlin, Jr.
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Joseph J McMahon, Jr.
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Daniel K. Astin
Ciardi, Ciardi & Astin, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
Global Information Technology, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher C. Todd
Inter Alia Legal, Apc
contact info
Ronald J. Drescher
Drescher & Associates, PA
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Ciber, Inc., et al.
Represented By
Christina M. Sanfelippo
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC
contact info
Tina Niehold Moss
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Schuyler G. Carroll
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC
contact info
John David Penn
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Amtex Enterprises
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
David Blaise Rao
Binder & Malter LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Polsinelli PC
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Symmetrix Solutions
Represented By
Christian Carl Onsager
Onsager Fletcher Johnson LLC
contact info
Interested Party
South Carolina Dept. Employment & Workforce
P.O. Box 8597 1550 Gadsden Street
Columbia, SC 29202
Represented By
Eugene B McLeod
Sc Department Of Employment & Workforce
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Certain Non-Insider Employees
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
ScanSource, Inc.
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Capgemini America, Inc.
Represented By
Jason M. Liberi
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Mark A. McDermott
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher
contact info
Raquelle L. Kaye
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Paul Leake
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Interested Party
HTC Global Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David A. Lerner
Plunkett Cooney, P.C.
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Monster, Inc.
Represented By
Carl N. Kunz, III
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Madison Technology Group LLC
Represented By
Brenna Anne Dolphin
Morris James LLP
contact info
Carl N Kunz, III
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
DXC Technology and Enterprise Services LLC
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz, P.C.
contact info
Katharina Earle
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Jill B. Bienstock
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Digital Intelligence Systems, LLC
Represented By
Kyle J. Ortiz
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Interval Leisure Group, Inc.
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Respondent
SkillSoft Corporation
Represented By
William J. Hanlon
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
1429 1429 claims Claims Register Wed 01/22 12:53 PM
Final Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Numeric) Final Claims Register
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
1428 1428 claims Claims Register Wed 01/15 10:38 AM
Quarterly Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Numeric) Quarterly Claims Register