Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-10837
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2017
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 09, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Suniva, Inc.
5765 Peachtree Industrial Boulevard
Norcross, GA 30092
Represented By
Jeremy William Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Gianfranco Finizio
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Todd C. Meyers
contact info
David Ryan Slaugh
Potter Anderson & Corron LLP
contact info
Colin M. Bernardino
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Burleigh Singleton
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:38 PM EST
Attorney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
1201 North Market Street P.O. Box 1347
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Attorney
Seward & Kissel LLP
Represented By
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Claims Agent
Garden City Group, LLC
www.gardencitygroup.com 1985 Marcus Avenue, Ste. 200
Lake Success, NY 11042
Represented By
Lorri Staal
The Garden City Group, Inc.
contact info
Creditor
Asia Union Electronic Chemical Corporation
Represented By
Andrew L. Cole
Leclairryan
contact info
David S. Gragg
Langley & Banack Incorporated
contact info
Creditor
Posco Daewoo America Corp
Creditor
SQN Asset Servicing, LLC
Represented By
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Chad Schiefelbein
Vedder Price PC
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Allison B. Hudson
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter P.C.
contact info
Creditor
SunEdison Products Singapore Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Brian Fintan Moore
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kinetic Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Richard G. Placey
Montgomery,mccracken,walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Natalie D. Ramsey
Montgomery, Mccracken, Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Creditor
Nuechterlein Electric, Inc.
Couzens, Lansky< Fealk, Ellis, Roeder 39395 W. Twelve Mile Road Suite 200
Farmington Hills, MI 48331
Represented By
Mark S. Frankel
Couzens Lansky Fealk Ellis Roeder Lazar
contact info
Creditor
Gwinnett County Department of Water Resources
684 Winder Highway
Lawrenceville, GA 30045
Represented By
Melanie F Wilson
Gwinnett County Department Of Law
contact info
Jennifer Brooke Savage
Gwinnett County
contact info
Creditor
Gwinnett County Department of Planning & Development
One Justice Square 446 West Crogan Street
Lawrenceville, GA 30046
Represented By
Melanie F Wilson
Gwinnett County Department Of Law
contact info
Jennifer Brooke Savage
Gwinnett County
contact info
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ellen Slights
contact info
Creditor
Evoqua Water Technologies LLC
Represented By
Robert A Ranieri
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Samuel Robert Grego
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Wanxiang America Corporation
Represented By
Willliam J. Barrett
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Kenneth J. Enos
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Edmon L. Morton
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Edlen Peachtree, LLC and CH Peachtree Associates, LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Victor W. Newmark
Wiles And Wiles
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Richard W Esterkin
contact info
Kelly A. Costello
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bierlein Investments, LLC
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Rozanne M Giunta
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
B.E. Capital Management Fund LP
205 East 42nd Street 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
ASYS Group Americas Inc.
1311 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19806
Represented By
Garvan F. McDaniel
Hogan Mcdaniel
contact info
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
John R. Ashmead
Seward & Kissel, LLP
contact info
Robert J. Gayda
Seward And Kissel LLP
contact info
Eric D. Schwartz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Catherine V. LoTempio
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Department of Energy
Represented By
I-Heng Hsu
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Theodore Randles
C/o United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Interested Party
Veritiv Corporation
Represented By
Katherine Monica Devanney
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Jessica C. Knowles-Boelter
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Woongjin Energy Co., LTD.
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
John D. Kimball
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Michael B. Schaedle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lion Point Capital, LP
Represented By
Katherine E. Massey
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Soltman
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Thomas S. Kessler
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Sean A. O'Neal
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Jane VanLare
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Karen B. Skomorucha Owens
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
SQN Asset Servicing LLC, SQN Asset Finance Income Fund Limited and SQN Gamma, LLC
Represented By
Douglas J. Lipke
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Rinchem Company, Inc.
Represented By
Spencer Edelman
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris Sisk PA
contact info
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
David M. Powlen
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
Interested Party
Lion Point Master LP
Interested Party
Linde Gas North America LLC
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Joshua W. Cohen
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Interested Party
KCH Services, Inc.
Represented By
Carl N. Kunz, III
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Georgia Tech Research Corporation
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Geodis USA, Inc.
Represented By
Charles J. Brown
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Civic Solar Inc
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Mar 16 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION (related document(s)479, 499) (LJH)
GPO Mar 25 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION (related document(s)1019) (LJH)
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, February 05, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 02/05 8:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1397 1397 claims Claims Register Tue 01/30 11:26 AM
Final Claims Register Numerical . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-]
1396 1396 claims Claims Register Tue 01/30 11:23 AM
Final Claims Register Alphabetical . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-]