Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10837

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:18-ap-50687
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2018
Terminated:Nov 21, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Suniva, Inc.
5765 Peachtree Industrial Boulevard
Norcross, GA 30092
Represented By
Suniva, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Lion Point Capital, LP
Represented By
Lion Point Capital, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
SQN Asset Servicing, LLC
Represented By
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
124 124 notice Service - Notice Wed 11/21 2:41 PM
Notice of Service re: Further Redacted Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Related [+] Filed by Suniva, Inc. (McNeill, R. Stephen)
Related: [-] 117
123 123 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 11/21 9:31 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Action Filed by SQN Asset Servicing, LLC (Fournier, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/21 11:48 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50687 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
122 122 2 pgs order Approving Settlement Tue 11/20 10:51 AM
Order Approving the Global Settlement Agreement Related [+] Order Signed on 11/20/2018. (RC)
Related: [-] 111
121 121 order File Under Seal Tue 11/20 10:50 AM
Order Granting Motion of the Debtor for Authority to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of the Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Related [+] Order Signed on 11/20/2018. (RC)
Related: [-] 112
120 120 court Minute Entry Tue 11/20 10:48 AM
Minute Entry Re: Appearance: SEE ATTACHED SIGN-IN-SHEETS (Sherrys)
Related: [-]
119 119 misc Settlement Agreement Tue 11/20 10:16 AM
[SEALED]Settlement Agreement Filed by Suniva, Inc.. (McNeill, R. Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
118 118 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 11/16 11:41 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Suniva, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (McNeill, R. Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
117 117 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Thu 11/15 7:55 PM
Further Redacted Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Filed by Suniva, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/20/2018. (McNeill, R. Stephen) Modified text on 11/16/2018 (RC)
Related: [-]
116 116 notice Service - Notice Thu 11/15 5:52 PM
Notice of Service Related [+] Filed by Suniva, Inc. (McNeill, R. Stephen)
Related: [-] 111 ,112 ,113
115 115 order Allow Thu 11/15 11:09 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Scheduling an Expedited Hearing and Shortening Notice with Respect to (I) Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement and (II) The Related Motion to Seal Related [+] Order Signed on 11/15/2018. (RC)
Related: [-] 113
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
114 114 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Wed 11/14 7:33 PM
[REDACTED] Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Related [+] Filed by Suniva, Inc. (McNeill, R. Stephen) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)111
113 113 motion Allow - Motion Wed 11/14 7:23 PM
Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Scheduling an Expedited Hearing and Shortening Notice with Respect to (I) Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement and (II) The Related Motion to Seal Filed by Suniva, Inc. (McNeill, R. Stephen) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (RC)
Related: [-]
112 112 motion File Under Seal - Motion (A) Wed 11/14 7:18 PM
Motion of the Debtor for Authority to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of the Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Filed by Suniva, Inc. Related [+] (McNeill, R. Stephen). Modified text and linkage on 11/15/2018 (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)111
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
111 111 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Wed 11/14 7:12 PM
[SEALED] Motion for Approval of Global Settlement Agreement Filed by Suniva, Inc. (McNeill, R. Stephen) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (RC)
Related: [-]