District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Loren L Alikhan
Case #: 1:17-cv-00752
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2017
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:33 AM EDT
Defendant
THOMAS COLLINS
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
DONNA HANSBERRY
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS HARKER
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
JOHN KELLY
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
DONNA PRESTIA
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
JAMES TROMMATTER
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN
Represented By
William Mark Nebeker
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
ANICA ASHBOURNE
7422 Drumlea Road
Capitol Heights, MD 20743

GPO Mar 27 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting on other grounds 2 plaintiff's motion to stay; granting in part and denying in part 8 defendants' motion to dismiss; denying 13 plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to effect service. This case is hereby STAYED pending the D.C. Circuit's decision in Case No. 17-5136. The parties are directed to file their recommendations for further proceedings within fifteen days of the D.C. Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of the Memorandum Opinion and Order to Ms. Ashbourne's address of record by first class mail, certified receipt. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/27/2018. (lcegs3)
GPO Jul 17 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons stated in the attached document, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 30 will be granted. A separate order will issue. See document for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 7/17/2024. (lclla1)
GPO Feb 19 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached document, Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal 62 and Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment 59 are denied. See document for details. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 02/19/2025. (lclla1)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 9:01 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5146 for64 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by ANICA ASHBOURNE. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
65 65 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/22 7:54 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re64 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
64 64 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 04/22 7:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to63 Order, Memorandum & Opinion, by ANICA ASHBOURNE. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 209444. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (mg)
Related: [-]