Original Case: 1:17-cv-00752

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05146
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Donna Hansberry, Director, Global High Wealth
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Donna Prestia, Assistant Director, Global High Wealth
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas Collins, Territory Manager, Global High Wealth
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Scott Bessent, Secretary, U.S. Department of the Treasury
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas W. Harker, Deputy Chief,
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
James Trommatter, Director, Security Center
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Kristi Noem, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Anica Ashbourne
Represented By
Anica Ashbourne
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 5:14 AM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5146
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2112934] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 8536 19] of order [2112932-4]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/27/2025 from Anica Ashbourne. 25-5146
Related: [-]
25 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112766] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-00752-LLA filed by Anica Ashbourne. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5146 25-5146
Related: [-]
3 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112932] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/09/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/09/2025 25-5146
Related: [-]