Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-18274

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:17-ap-01294
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2017
Terminated:Feb 05, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tony Busam
5156 Vale Court SE
Salem, OR 97306
Represented By
Tony Busam
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy King
Bederson & Company, LLP. 347 Mt. Pleasant Avenue
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Brian Thomas Crowley
Mcdonnell Crowley, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 02/20 9:06 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Tony Busam 5156 Vale Court SE Salem, OR 97306-1069 , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 18 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thursday, February 07, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 02/08 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
17 17 order To Close Case Tue 02/05 9:57 AM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 3:2017-ap-1294-MBK). Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/5/2019. (wir)
Related: [-] 15 Money Judgment
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 02/05 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 17-01294 MBK) Closed. (wir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 02/01 9:30 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Tony Busam 5156 Vale Court SE Salem, OR 97306-1069 , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sunday, January 20, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 01/21 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
15 15 order Money Judgment Fri 01/18 11:32 AM
Money Judgment in favor of Timothy King and against Tony Busam in the amount of at least $ 70,612.21 Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/18/2019 (wir)
Related: [-] 10 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Timothy King
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
court Hearing Held Wed 01/16 12:08 PM
Minute of 1/16/19; GRANTED Related [+] (kmf)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Friday, January 04, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 01/05 1:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
13 13 misc General Order - Shutdown 2018 Mon 12/31 11:45 AM
GENERAL ORDER INCORPORATING BY REFERENCE STANDING ORDER 18-4 OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY AS APPLIED TO BANKRUPTCY CASES AND ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS. All litigation in a bankruptcy case or adversary proceeding pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey involving as a party the United States of America, its agencies, and/or any other party represented by the Department of Justice or the United States Attorneys Office is immediately suspended, and held in abeyance continuing either (1) until the federal government is funded through congressional appropriation, or (2) for a period of 30 days from the date of the District Court Standing Order 18-4, whichever comes sooner. This Order includes as to the United States, the Department of Justice, or the U.S. Attorneys Office, the suspension of all pending deadlines to file proofs of claim, objections to: discharge, dischargeability, and confirmation of cases under Chapter 11 or Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code for this period. Notice of the entry of this order under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9022 has been given to the following parties in this case: All registered efiling attorneys, self-represented debtors (if this is a bankruptcy case,) or self-represented plaintiffs and defendants (if this is an adversary proceeding.) Please see the Court's website, njb.uscourts.gov for more information as it becomes available.. (jml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 12/12 9:37 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Tony Busam 5156 Vale Court SE Salem, OR 97306-1069 , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Friday, November 30, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/01 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
11 11 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Wed 11/28 1:03 PM
PROOF HEARING: Related [+]. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. Hearing scheduled for 1/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir)
Related: [-] 10 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Defendant, Tony Busam filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian T. Crowley, Esq. # 2 Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment Against Defendant, Tony Busam # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Plaintiff Timothy King
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
10 10 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Tue 11/20 10:11 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Defendant, Tony Busam filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brian T. Crowley, Esq.
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment Against Defendant, Tony Busam
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 08, 2018
court Receipt - Generic - BK - Court Use Only Mon 06/11 8:06 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 620840. Fee received from RCC Consultants (mrg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 04/17 8:18 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Tony Busam 5156 Vale Court SE Salem, OR 97306-1069 , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 9 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Friday, March 30, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 03/31 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
8 8 court Entry of Default Wed 03/28 4:23 PM
Entry of Default against Tony Busam Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. (wir)
Related: [-] 6 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Timothy King
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/27 2:09 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-] 6 Request to Enter Default Against Tony Busam filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Entry of Default) filed by Plaintiff Timothy King
6 6 misc Request to Enter Default Tue 03/27 1:44 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Tony Busam filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Entry of Default
Monday, March 19, 2018
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 03/23 10:18 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Tony Busam 5156 Vale Court SE Salem, OR 97306-1069 , Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 5 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 03/01 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
4 4 order File Default Papers Mon 02/26 3:36 PM
ORDER TO FILE DEFAULT PAPERS. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/26/2018. Deadline to file default papers is 3/28/2018. (bwj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
court Hearing Held Wed 02/21 10:34 AM
Minute of 2/21/18; ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE FILED BY 3/21 PER EMAIL Related [+] (kmf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 11/15 12:56 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/15/17 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 10/04 12:36 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 10/4/17 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 09/06 10:48 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 9/6/17 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 07/05 12:31 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 7/5/2017 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir)
Related: [-] 2 PRE TRIAL
Sunday, May 07, 2017
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Sun 05/07 12:12 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of Timothy King. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy King,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, April 27, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/27 8:46 AM
Summons Issued to Timothy King for Service on Tony Busam Answer due on 5/30/2017 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 7/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (mrg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/26 5:55 PM
Adversary case 17-01294 Complaint by Timothy King against Tony Busam. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A