New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:15-bk-18274
Case Filed:May 01, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 04, 2015
Claims Deadline:Sep 02, 2015
Terminated:Apr 02, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jul 08, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
RCC Consultants, Inc.
100 Woodbridge Center Dr Ste 201
Woodbridge, NJ 07095-1125
Represented By
Paul John Labov
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Anthony Sodono, III
Trenk, Dipasquale, Della Fera & Sodono
contact info
Joao Ferreira Magalhaes
Trenk, Dipasquale Et. Al.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy King
Bederson & Company, LLP. 347 Mt. Pleasant Avenue
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Brian Thomas Crowley
Mcdonnell Crowley, LLC
contact info
John Michael McDonnell
Mcdonnell Crowley, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Saturday, April 04, 2020
583 583 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 04/05 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
582 582 order Final Decree Thu 04/02 4:37 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (gan)
Related: [-]
581 581 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 04/02 4:06 PM
ORDER CLOSING THE BANKRUPTCY CASE Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/2/2020. (wir)
Related: [-] 324 Notice of Intention to Close Case. Hearing date if Objection filed: 1/9/2017 at 11:00 a.m.. Notice served on the debtor, debtor's attorney, attorney for creditors' committee, if any, Trustee, if any and United States Trustee. Objections due by 1/3/2017.Deadline to close chapter 11 case is 1/9/2017. (wir)
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 04/02 4:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (gan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 29, 2020
580 580 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 03/30 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]