Kim et al v. Arias
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nina Gershon |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02540 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1364 Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 25, 2017 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jose Arias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tan Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jae Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 10/13 12:10 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Jae Lee, Tan Kim. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective September 5, 2017 for failure of Appellant to either pay the filing fee in full or move for IFP by that date. Issued as Mandate: 10/13/17. USCA 17-2216 (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Filing Fee Due
Wed 07/19 10:24 AM
APPEAL FILING FEE DUE re14 Notice of Appeal Payment in the amount of $505.00, can be made in person to the clerks office, or mailed in or paid online with the event Civil Case Appeal Filing Fee . (McGee, Mary Ann) |
||
appeal
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
Wed 07/19 10:24 AM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.14 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/18 7:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,13 Clerk's Judgment, by Tan Kim, Jae Lee. (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 07/12 9:23 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendant's motion to dismiss the action for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted; and that the case is dismissed. Ordered by Clerk of Court, by Deputy Clerk Janet Hamilton, on 7/11/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 07/11 12:04 PM
ORDER granting defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and dismissing the case. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 7/10/2017. (Barrett, C) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 07/07 7:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nina Gershon: Case called. Jae Soog Lee, Esq. for the plaintiffs. Scott Dinstell, Esq. for defendant. Pre Motion Conference held on 7/6/2017. For the reasons stated on the record, the case is dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Joe, Victor) |
||
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 07/11 11:47 AM
Oral MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jose Arias. (Barrett, C) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 06/30 12:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 Amended MOTION for pre motion conference ,5 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Sun 06/25 2:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE by Tan Kim, Jae Lee (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 06/25 1:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jae Soog Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/21 3:54 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Pre Motion Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6D South before Judge Nina Gershon. Plaintiffs should file a substantive response to the May 10, 2017 letter by defendant requesting a pre-motion conference, and also include in the letter the grounds for any applications they wish to file, by June 29, 2017. (Shalev, Roee) |
|
utility
Terminate Motions (filed in error)
Wed 06/21 1:18 PM
Motion terminated, filed incorrectly:5 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Jose Arias. Subsequent amended version filed as document6 . (Barrett, C) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 06/20 2:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nina Gershon for all further proceedings (as related to 16-cv-5762). Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/20/2017. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 06/02 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference originally scheduled for June 6, 2017 is adjourned sine die. (Bendheim, Gilad) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 05/31 12:28 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order extension of time by Tan Kim, Jae Lee (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/22 9:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A pre-motion conference on Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and motion for costs will be held on June 6, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Bendheim, Gilad) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/10 4:12 PM
Amended MOTION for pre motion conference by Jose Arias. (Dinstell, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/10 3:40 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Jose Arias. (Dinstell, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/28 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Jose Arias. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/28 2:58 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/28 2:58 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/28 1:12 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9485395 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tan Kim, Jae Lee. (Lee, Jae Soog) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/28 2:57 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |