Heckmann Water Resources Corporation
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10949
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10949
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10954 |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Heckmann Water Resources Corporation
14624 N Scottsdale Rd Ste 300
Scottsdale, AZ 85254-2758 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Claims Register
Thu 07/05 3:49 PM
Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
Att: 1 Final Claims Register (Numeric) | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Final Decree
Fri 06/22 10:36 AM
Final Decree and Order Closing the Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services Order Signed on 6/22/2018 (LMD) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 06/22 10:44 AM
Bankruptcy Case 17-10954 Closed (LMD) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 06/27 9:42 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Heckmann Water Resources Corporation. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 05/02 12:33 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case under Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Nuverra Environmental Solutions, Inc. and its debtor affiliates. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in the docket in the chapter 11 case of Nuverra Environmental Solutions, Inc., Case No. 17-10949 (KJC) and such docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this chapter 11 case. Order Signed on 5/2/2017 (LMD) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/01 6:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10954 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8432366, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 05/01 3:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Heckmann Water Resources Corporation. (Morgan, Pauline) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 05/01 7:45 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |