Raceway Central Wheaton LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10993
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10993
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11001 |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Raceway Central Wheaton LLC
2600 Haven Ave
Joliet, IL 60433-8467 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/06 1:41 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LB) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Transferring
Tue 06/20 3:12 PM
Order transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois. (NAB) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Fri 05/05 4:02 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Central Grocers, Inc., CGI Joliet, LLC, Currency Express, Inc., Raceway Central,LLC, Raceway Central Calumet Park LLC, Raceway Central Chicago Heights LLC, Raceway Central Downers Grove LLC, Raceway Central Joliet North LLC, Raceway Central LLC North Valpo, Raceway Central Wheaton LLC, Strack and Van Til Super Market, Inc., and SVT, LLC. The docket in Case No. 17-10993 (LSS)] should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Order Signed on 5/5/2017 (LMD) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 05/04 12:20 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/04 10:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11001 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8437448, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Thu 05/04 10:27 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Central Grocers, Inc.. (Collins, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 05/04 10:14 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Raceway Central Wheaton LLC. (Collins, Mark) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 05/04 10:22 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |