Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 5:17-cv-00095
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 04, 2017
Re-opened:Mar 01, 2019
Terminated:Feb 20, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 31, 2017 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Correct Care, LLC
Defendant
Amy Goldstein
Defendant
Mary Leaks
Defendant
Marsha Mclane - TCCO Executive Director
Represented By
Celamaine Cunniff
Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Carol M Garcia
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Janie Salazar
Defendant
Michael Searcy
Represented By
Celamaine Cunniff
Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Carol M Garcia
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Brian Thomas
Defendant
Bill Vanier
Defendant
Christopher Woods
Plaintiff
Lonnie Kade Welsh
Texas Civil Commitment Center 2600 South Sunset Ave.
Littlefield, TX 79339

GPO Dec 05 2019
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 74 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Lonnie Kade Welsh. Because the Court's denial of Welsh's request to appoint an expert in this case does not involve a controlling question of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion, nor would an immediate appeal from the denial materially advance the ultimate termination of the litigation, the undersigned recommends that the United States District Court deny Welsh's "Certificate to certify an order for appeal." ECF No. 74. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 12/5/2019) (bmh)
GPO Dec 12 2019
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation 75 for clear error and finds none. It is therefore ORDERED that the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation are hereby ADOPTED as the findings and conclusions of the Court. For the reasons stated therein, Plaintiff's "Certificate to certify an order for appeal 74" is hereby DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/12/2019) (bmh)
GPO Jan 30 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) be GRANTED and that the United States District Court dismiss with prejudice Welsh's Amended Complaint filed on August 8, 2019, and all claims therein for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 1/30/2020) (bmh)
GPO Feb 20 2020
Order: The Court finds that Plaintiff's objections should be OVERRULED. The Court has further conducted an independent review of the Magistrate Judge's findings and conclusions and finds no error. It is therefore ORDERED that the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation are hereby ADOPTED as the findings and conclusions of the Court re: 81 Report and Recommendation. for the reasons stated therein, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/20/2020) (bdg)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 10, 2022
97 97 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/10 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Lonnie Kade Welsh. New address: Texas Civil Commitment Center 2600 South Sunset Avenue Littlefield, TX 79339. (krr)
Related: [-]