MAR Farms, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40075
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40075
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William J Fisher |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41371 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
MAR Farms, LLC
6340 Industrial Boulevard
Eden Prairie, MN 55346 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2017 7:00 PM CDT |
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/08 11:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-41371 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9982381. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Mon 05/08 11:34 AM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Midwest Asphalt Corporation, Wells Fargo. (Flynn, Thomas) |
||
trustee
MNB Add attorney for US Trustee
Mon 05/08 3:59 PM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Fadlovich, Michael) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: MAR Farms, LLC. Fee Amount $1717.00. Incomplete Filings due by 05/22/2017. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 11/6/2017. Ch 11 Small Business Plan/Disclosure Statement deadline is 03/5/2018. (Flynn, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice requiring filing of complete matrix. Incomplete Filings due by 5/22/2017. (LindaS MNBM) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order reassigning chapter 11 case. Involvement of Michael E Ridgway terminated. Judge William J Fisher added to case. (Ridgway,J.:5/8/17) (Michael MNBM) |