Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:17-bk-40075
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2017
Terminated:Mar 02, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Midwest Asphalt Corporation
P.O. Box 5477
Hopkins, MN 55343
Represented By
Thomas Flynn
Larkin Hoffman Daly & Lindgren
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 01/11/2017 6:00 PM CST
Thursday, January 12, 2017
crditcrd none Thu 01/12 12:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-40075 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9809451. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court MNB Notice re: submission of scanned documents Thu 01/12 12:16 PM
Notice to attorney re: (1 Voluntary chapter 11 petition,2 Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing). The document submitted has scanned pages other than signature pages and exhibits. Local Rule 9004-1(e) limits the submission of scanned pages to signature pages and exhibits. Future documents must be submitted in compliance with the scanning requirements of Local Rule 9004-1(e). For instructions on preparing an electronic document for filing to CM/ECF, please see How do I prepare an electronic document for filing to CM/ECF on the court`s website, www.mnb.uscourts.gov under FAQ, then CM/ECF Questions. (Heidi MNBM)
Related: [-]
trustee MNB Add attorney for US Trustee Thu 01/12 1:41 PM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Fadlovich, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Thu 01/12 3:15 PM
List of Creditors load 22 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee) Thu 01/12 12:00 PM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: Midwest Asphalt Corporation. Fee Amount $1717.00. Incomplete Filings due by 01/26/2017.Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 05/12/2017. (Flynn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Thu 01/12 12:08 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by Midwest Asphalt Corporation (Flynn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 court MNB Notice requiring filing of complete matrix Thu 01/12 1:29 PM
Notice requiring filing of complete matrix. Incomplete Filings due by 1/26/2017. (Heidi MNBM)
Related: [-]