Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40075

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:17-bk-41372
Case Filed:May 08, 2017
Terminated:Mar 02, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Delta Milling, LLC
6340 Industrial Boulevard
Eden Prairie, MN 55346
Represented By
Thomas Flynn
Larkin Hoffman Daly & Lindgren
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 05/07/2017 7:00 PM CDT
Monday, May 08, 2017
crditcrd none Mon 05/08 11:42 AM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-41372 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9982411. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Mon 05/08 11:44 AM
Added creditor to matrix. Creditor(s) added to the case: Midwest Asphalt Corporation. (Flynn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
trustee MNB Add attorney for US Trustee Mon 05/08 3:58 PM
Attorney for US Trustee added to case. (Fadlovich, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee) Mon 05/08 11:40 AM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: Delta Milling, LLC. Fee Amount $1717.00. Incomplete Filings due by 05/22/2017. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 11/6/2017. Ch 11 Small Business Plan/Disclosure Statement deadline is 03/5/2018. (Flynn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Notice requiring filing of complete matrix Mon 05/08 3:15 PM
Notice requiring filing of complete matrix. Incomplete Filings due by 5/22/2017. (Grace MNBM)
Related: [-]