Marsh RE Property, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11066
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11066
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11077 |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Marsh RE Property, LLC
9800 Crosspoint Blvd
Indianapolis, IN 46256-3300 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Claims Register
Thu 04/22 4:23 PM
Final Claims Register (Alpha) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 (Numeric) Final Claim Register | ||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 12/21 1:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Mml) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Thu 06/08 9:57 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Marsh RE Property, LLC. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Thu 06/08 9:57 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Marsh RE Property, LLC. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Fri 05/12 1:10 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Marsh Supermarkets Holding, LLC, Case No. 17-11066 (BLS), Marsh Merger Sub, LLC, Case No. 17-11067 (BLS), Marsh Supermarkets Company, LLC, Case No. 17-11068 (BLS), A.L. Ross & Sons, LLC, Case No. 17-11069 (BLS), Contract Transport Holding, LLC, Case No. 17-11070 (BLS), Contract Transport, LLC, Case No. 17-11071 (BLS), CT Logistics, LLC, Case No. 17-11072 (BLS), LoBill Foods, LLC, Case No. 17-11073 (BLS), Marsh Drugs Holding, LLC, Case No. 17-11074 (BLS), Marsh Drugs, LLC, Case No. 17-11075 (BLS), Marsh International, LLC, Case No. 17-11076 (BLS), Marsh RE Property, LLC, Case No. 17-11077 (BLS), Marsh Supermarkets, LLC, Case No. 17-11078 (BLS), MS Property, LLC, Case No. 17-11079 (BLS), Marsh Supermarkets of Illinois, LLC, Case No. 17-11080 (BLS), and OMalia Food Markets, LLC, Case No. 17-11081 (BLS). The docket in the chapter 11 case of Marsh Supermarkets Holdings, LLC, Case No. 17-11066 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/12/2017 (SJS) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/11 10:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11077 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8445632, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 05/11 10:19 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Marsh RE Property, LLC. (Nestor, Michael) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 05/11 10:38 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (AK) |