Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11101

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:17-bk-11113
Case Filed:May 14, 2017
Terminated:Oct 04, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ashford Holding Corp.
11840 Westline Industrial Dr
Saint Louis, MO 63146-3318
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Friday, July 17, 2020
17 17 claims Claims Register Fri 07/17 11:23 AM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 10/04 3:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
16 16 3 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 4:41 PM
Order and Final Decree Closing Non-Lead Case Order Signed on 10/3/2019. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
15 15 court Case Reassigned Thu 04/11 9:06 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
14 14 claims Claims Register Thu 10/11 6:20 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
13 13 claims Claims Register Fri 07/06 7:44 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
12 12 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 05/15 9:54 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Ashford Holding Corp. Filed by Ashford Holding Corp.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 05/15 9:52 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Ashford Holding Corp. Filed by Ashford Holding Corp.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
10 10 claims Claims Register Mon 04/02 10:13 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
9 9 claims Claims Register Tue 01/02 7:33 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
8 8 claims Claims Register Mon 10/02 6:07 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 07/11 4:50 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors,. -- Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Ashford Holding Corp. (Case No. 17-11113 Filed by Ashford Holding Corp.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 07/11 4:45 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. -- Statement of Financial Affairs for Ashford Holding Corp. (Case No. 17-11113 Filed by Ashford Holding Corp.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
5 5 claims Claims Register Wed 07/05 10:46 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by JND Corporate Restructuring. (JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 05/16 4:27 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Katy Industries, Inc., Case No. 17-11101 (KJC), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 17-11101 (KJC) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 5/16/2017 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
court Case Assigned Mon 05/15 8:17 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 14, 2017
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion Sun 05/14 9:06 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Ashford Holding Corp.(Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 05/14 10:25 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11113 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8448432, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 05/14 10:16 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Ashford Holding Corp.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]