Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:17-bk-11101
Case Filed:May 14, 2017
Terminated:Aug 25, 2023
Plan Confirmed:May 02, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
KII Liquidating Inc.
11840 Westline Industrial Drive Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63146
Represented By
Daniel Simon
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Oksana Koltko Rosaluk
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
John Lyons
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:32 PM EST
Claims Agent
JND Corporate Restructuring
www.JNDLA.com 8269 E. 23rd Avenue, Suite 275
Denver, CO 80238
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Joseph Corrigan
Iron Mountain Information Management, Ll
contact info
Creditor
Toyota Industries Commercial Finance, Inc.
Represented By
Scott D. Fink
Weltman Weinberg & Reis, Co., Pla
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Rifino
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David A. White
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Kate R. Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Office of the Attorney General c/o Christopher R. Momjian 21 S. 12th St., 3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
Christopher R. Momjian
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
YRC Inc. d/b/a YRC Freight
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ellen Slights
contact info
Creditor
Daniel J Esposito
Mulvey Law LLC 133 W. Market St. #274
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Joseph L Mulvey
Mulvey Law LLC
contact info
Creditor
Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
2-8 Haven Avenue, Suite 220
Port Washington, NY 11050
Represented By
Adam L. Rosen
Adam L. Rosen PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Continental Commercial Products, LLC
Represented By
Chase N. Miller
Mccabe Weisberg & Conway PC
contact info
Janet Z. Charlton
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Kristi J. Doughty
Mccabe Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Michael K. Pak
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Majestic-Norwalk, LLC
Represented By
Mark G. Ledwin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Creditor
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
489 Fifth Avenue, 21st Floor Attn: Adam L. Rosen
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Adam L. Rosen
Adam L. Rosen PLLC
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller Of Public Accounts
Represented By
John Mark Stern
Office Of The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Creditor
Toyota Industries Commercial Finance
Represented By
Chase N. Miller
Mccabe Weisberg & Conway PC
contact info
Janet Z. Charlton
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Kristi J. Doughty
Mccabe Weisberg & Conway, LLC
contact info
Michael K. Pak
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
USF Holland Inc.
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
USF Reddaway Inc.
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
David J. Feldman
460 Conway Manor Drive
Atlanta, GA 30327
Represented By
Joel A. Kunin
Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Pessin Katz Law, P.A.
contact info
Emily K. Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Jason Custer Powell
The Powell Firm
contact info
Creditor
Equistar Chemicals, LP
Represented By
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Mark S. Finkelstein
Shannon, Martin, Finkelstein, Alvarado
contact info
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Labor & Industrial Relations
Michael Morris Missouri Attorney General's Office PO Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102
Represented By
Michael Morris
Missouri Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Encina Business Credit SPV, LLC
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Zachary J. Garrett
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
contact info
Jeremy M. Downs
Goldberg Kohn Ltd.
contact info
Creditor
C&S Business Services, Inc.
1731 Southridge Drive
Jefferson City, MO 65109
Represented By
Alicia E. Turner
Newman, Comley & Ruth P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Acropolis Technology Group
Represented By
Larry E. Parres
Lewis, Rice & Fingersh, L.C.
contact info
Creditor
Ohio Power Company; Indiana Michigan Power Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Russell R. Johnson, III
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii PLC
contact info
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W. Suite 340
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Quinette A. Bonds
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
contact info
Melissa Ngo
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
contact info
Creditor
Polymer Solutions International, Inc.
Represented By
Sharon L. Levine
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Premier Polymers, LLC, a Vinmar International Company
16800 Imperial Valley Drive Suite 499
Houston, TX 77060
Represented By
Jason Daniel Angelo
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Mark S. Finkelstein
Shannon, Martin, Finkelstein, Alvarado
contact info
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee P.C.
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Andrew J. Flame
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Steven K. Kortanek
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Robert K. Malone
contact info
Fee Examiner
M.J. Renick & Associates LLC
Interested Party
Tennessee Bottle Company
1226 Belmont Drive
McMinnville, TN 37110
Interested Party
State of Delaware, Division of Corporations
John G Townsend Bldg Suite 4 401 Federal St
Dover, DE 19901
Interested Party
State of California
Bankruptcy Section MS A340 Franchise Tax Board P.O. Box 2952
Sacramento, CA 95812
Interested Party
Reingard Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Jarrett Vine
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Official Committee Of Retirees
Represented By
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Mangan
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Highview Capital, LLC
Represented By
Robert Alan Weber
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Interested Party
IBM Corporation
Interested Party
Jansan Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Laukitis
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Robert Alan Weber
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Peter A. Siddiqui
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Gabelli Funds, LLC, GAMCO Asset Management Inc., Teton Advisors, Inc., and MJG Associates, Inc.
Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, P.A 919 N. Market Street, Suite 1401
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Joshua K Porter
Entwistle & Capucci LLP
contact info
Norman M. Monhait
Rosenthal Monhait & Goddess, P.A
contact info
Andrew J Entwistle
Entwistle & Capucci LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Victory Park Capital Advisors
Interested Party
De Nora Water Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin Scott Mann
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Plan Administrator
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Steven K. Kortanek
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plan Administrator
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
222 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Steven K. Kortanek
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Successor Trustee
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Jody C. Barillare
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Rachel Jaffe Mauceri
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Transcriber
EScribers, LLC
PO Box 7533
New York, NY 10116
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Friday, August 25, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 08/25 9:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]