Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Amy J St Eve
Case #: 1:17-cv-04008
Nature of Suit999 Civil - Miscellaneous
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 25, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2017 3:32 AM CST
Defendant
Zillow, Inc.
Represented By
Eric D. Brandfonbrener
Perkins Coie LLC
contact info
Eugene Volokh
Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
Perkins Coie
contact info
Defendant
Zillow Group, Inc.
Represented By
Eric D. Brandfonbrener
Perkins Coie LLC
contact info
Eugene Volokh
Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
Perkins Coie
contact info
Plaintiff
Castle Bldrs.com, Inc.
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info
David A. Novoselsky
Novoselsky Law Offices
contact info
Charles Jeffrey Thut
Noonan Perillo And Thut
contact info
Plaintiff
Bhasker T Patel
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info
David A. Novoselsky
Novoselsky Law Offices
contact info
Charles Jeffrey Thut
Noonan Perillo And Thut
contact info
Plaintiff
Jyotsna B Patel
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info
David A. Novoselsky
Novoselsky Law Offices
contact info
Charles Jeffrey Thut
Noonan Perillo And Thut
contact info
Plaintiff
Vipul B Patel
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info
David A. Novoselsky
Novoselsky Law Offices
contact info
Charles Jeffrey Thut
Noonan Perillo And Thut
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Koutropoulos
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ulysses Koutropouos
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
Andersen Law LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/23/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
GPO May 07 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/7/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.