Original Case: 1:17-cv-04008

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-02130
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:May 21, 2018
Terminated:Feb 08, 2019
Last checked: Monday Feb 11, 2019 2:28 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
ZILLOW, INC.
Represented By
Eugene Volokh
MAYER BROWN LLP
contact info
Eric D. Brandfonbrener
PERKINS COIE LLP
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
PERKINS COIE LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ZILLOW GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Eugene Volokh
MAYER BROWN LLP
contact info
Eric D. Brandfonbrener
PERKINS COIE LLP
contact info
Rebecca S. Engrav
PERKINS COIE LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VIPUL B. PATEL, individually
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
ANDERSEN LAW LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BHASKER T. PATEL, as the Co-Trustee of the Jyotsna B. Patel Living Trust dated March 9, 2001
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
ANDERSEN LAW LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JYOTSNA B. PATEL, as Co-Trustee of the Jyotsna B. Pastel Living Trust dated March 9, 2001
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
ANDERSEN LAW LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CASTLE BLDRS.COM, INC., an Illinois corporation
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
ANDERSEN LAW LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NANCY KOUTROPOULOS
Represented By
Barbara Andersen
ANDERSEN LAW LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 08 2019
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. AFFIRMED. William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge; Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge and Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge. [6983177-1] [6983177] [18-2130]

Docket last updated: 02/11/2019 2:25 AM CST
Monday, May 21, 2018
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 06/04/2018. Appellants' brief due on or before 07/02/2018 for Castle Bldrs.com, Inc., Nancy Koutropoulos, Bhasker T. Patel, Jyotsna B. Patel and Vipul B. Patel. [1] [6926204] 18-2130 (ER) [Entered: 05/21/2018 12:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 38 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEE: Ulysses Koutropouos. [2] [6926205] 18-2130 (ER) [Entered: 05/21/2018 12:49 PM]
Related: [-]