Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03023
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 31, 2017
Terminated:Sep 21, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.
Represented By
Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
misc Certified Copy Request Tue 01/21 3:09 PM
Request For a Certified Copy of document23 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk. - Fee Amount $11.The Document(s) will be mailed to the address on record in the ECF system OR to the specific address entered during the docketing of this event. Alternate mailing address (if applicable): . Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk
crditcrd none Tue 01/21 3:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Certified Copy Request 17-03023 jal) [misc,certcopy] ( 11.00). Receipt number 9279621 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Thursday, September 21, 2017
court Close Case -AP Thu 09/21 7:51 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 09/09 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services(Related Doc21 ) Entered on 9/6/2017.
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
23 23 order Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk Wed 09/06 10:53 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Service Related [+] Entered on 9/6/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, September 01, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 09/02 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services, Inc (related document(s)19 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley).
21 21 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(1) Fri 09/01 12:10 PM
Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
20 20 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 08/30 4:05 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services, Inc Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 19 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
19 19 motion Default - Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(a) Tue 08/22 4:09 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Saturday, August 19, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 08/20 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 PDF Notice Request regarding (related document(s)16 Order Striking10 Answer to Complaint ).
Thursday, August 17, 2017
17 17 notice PDF Notice Request-Selected Parties Thu 08/17 1:34 PM
PDF Notice Request regarding Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 16 Order Striking10 Answer to Complaint
16 16 order Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/17 1:33 PM
Order Striking10 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. Entered on 8/17/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 07/31 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 PDF Notice Request to defendant regarding (related documents- Order To Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial.) (Pierce, M) Modified on 7/28/2017 .
Friday, July 28, 2017
14 14 notice PDF Notice Request Fri 07/28 3:15 PM
PDF Notice Request to defendant regarding Related [+] (Pierce, M) Modified on 7/28/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] - Order To Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial.
13 13 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial/Trial Fri 07/28 3:15 PM
Order To CONTINUE Pre-trial Conference, at which time, the Defendant, Hinlar Cell Site Services, Inc. shall appear and show cause why its Answer should not be stricken for failure to obtain counsel per the Court's Notice of Deficiency entered on 7/5/17. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 7/28/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 07/08 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Entry and Notice of Deficiency regarding10 Answer to Complaint. Filed by Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1074-1, documents filed by corporations must be filed with representation by counsel. The Answer was filed by the defendant corporation, pro se. Defendant is directed to obtain legal counsel and have said counsel file an appearance no later than the Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/27/2017.
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
11 11 utility Entry - With Service Via BNC Wed 07/05 1:58 PM
Entry and Notice of Deficiency regarding10 Answer to Complaint. Filed by Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1074-1, documents filed by corporations must be filed with representation by counsel. The Answer was filed by the defendant corporation, pro se. Defendant is directed to obtain legal counsel and have said counsel file an appearance no later than the Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/27/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/05 1:54 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/05 4:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. on June 5, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
8 8 misc Amended Complaint Fri 06/02 2:18 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/02 2:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keith J. Larson . Filed by on behalf of Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Document (Generic) Fri 06/02 2:10 PM
Document: Notice of Defendant's Address Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Required Action
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
5 5 court Notice of Required Action Wed 05/31 4:29 PM
Notice of Required Action - no address was listed for the Defendant in CM/ECF or the complaint. Attorney is directed to provide an address for the Defendant upon receipt of this notice. Related [+]. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03023
4 4 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Wed 05/31 4:17 PM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc. Answer Due 6/30/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) for Telephonic Hearing. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 vorder Defer Fee - AP Wed 05/31 4:16 PM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 07-3023 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 05/31 9:50 AM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/31 9:46 AM
Adversary case 17-03023 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Hinlar Cell Site Services Inc.. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A