Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03024
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 31, 2017
Terminated:Sep 28, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By
JP Morgan Chase & Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
court Close Case -AP Thu 09/28 9:35 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
15 15 order Settlement Agreement Wed 09/13 10:21 AM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement Related [+] Entered on 9/13/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, August 24, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Fri 08/25 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 08/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)12 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley). Objections due by 9/12/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
13 13 notice Objections Tue 08/22 7:25 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 9/12/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Monday, August 21, 2017
12 12 motion Approve Settlement Mon 08/21 3:08 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, August 14, 2017
11 11 order Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Mon 08/14 11:43 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time up to and including August 21, 2017 in which to file a Motion to Approve Settlemen Related [+] Document due by 8/21/2017. Entered on 8/14/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, August 11, 2017
10 10 motion Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Fri 08/11 2:57 PM
Motion to Extend time to File Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 28, 2017
9 9 vorder Remanding from the Docket-Hearing Fri 07/28 1:31 PM
Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on July 27, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03024 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21568827,'Wheatley_v_JP_Morgan_Chase__Co',1);">1 . The parties advised the Court that an Agreed Order will be filed, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Agreed Motion/Order due by 8/11/2017. Upon failure to file said Agreed Motion/Order, the Court will schedule a Telephonic Status Hearing. (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/05 4:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bank Card Services, Inc., Chase Bank USA, NA, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA on June 5, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
7 7 misc Document (Generic) Fri 06/02 2:52 PM
Document: Notice of Defendant's Address Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] Notice of Required Action
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/02 2:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keith J. Larson . Filed by on behalf of Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
5 5 court Alias or Amended Summons Issued Thu 06/01 6:36 AM
Corrected Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Chase Bank Card Services, Inc. Answer Due 7/3/2017; Chase Bank USA, NA Answer Due 7/3/2017; JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA Answer Due 7/3/2017. - Corrected to include all names listed for Defendant. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
4 4 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Wed 05/31 4:31 PM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on JP Morgan Chase & Co. Answer Due 6/30/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) for Telephonic Hearing. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 vorder Defer Fee - AP Wed 05/31 4:21 PM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3024 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 05/31 11:55 AM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03024 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against JP Morgan Chase & Co.. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/31 11:51 AM
Adversary case 17-03024 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
court Notice of Required Action Wed 05/31 4:32 PM
Notice of Required Action - no address was listed for the Defendant in CM/ECF or the complaint. Attorney is directed to provide an address for the Defendant upon receipt of this notice. Related [+]. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03024