Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03025
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2017
Terminated:Mar 01, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Power Proz Construction LLC
2075 Open Fork Rd
Morehead, KY 40351
Represented By
Power Proz Construction LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
court Close Case -AP Thu 03/01 10:36 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
39 39 order Settlement Agreement Wed 02/14 2:08 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement Related [+] Entered on 2/14/2018. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 37
38 38 notice Objections Wed 02/14 9:24 AM
**DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR** Notice for Objections regarding Motion to Approve Settlement37 . Objections due by 3/7/2018. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M) Modified on 2/14/2018 (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
37 37 motion Approve Settlement Tue 02/13 2:04 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Saturday, January 13, 2018
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 01/14 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 01/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE a Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference rescheduled for 2/13/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, January 11, 2018
35 35 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 01/11 1:18 PM
Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE a Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference rescheduled for 2/13/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Thu 01/11 12:20 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion To Vacate Default Judgment Related [+], Resolving Motion To Vacate and Extend Time
Related: [-] 33 26 . Entered on 1/11/2018. (Pierce, M
Monday, January 08, 2018
33 33 motion Vacate Mon 01/08 3:50 PM
Agreed Motion to Vacate Default Judgment Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC (Langdon, Dean)
Related: [-] 23 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant(Related Doc22 ) Entered on 10/13/2017., 32 Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the Status Hearing scheduled on January 4, 2018 on the Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment , Motion to Extend time to file answer. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 . The parties have advised the Court that an agreed order will be filed, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Agreed Motion/Order due by 1/26/2018. (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Friday, January 05, 2018
32 32 vorder Remanding from the Docket-Hearing Fri 01/05 9:23 AM
Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the Status Hearing scheduled on January 4, 2018 on the Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment , Motion to Extend time to file answer. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 . The parties have advised the Court that an agreed order will be filed, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Agreed Motion/Order due by 1/26/2018. (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 11/17 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 11/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the hearing held on November 14, 2017 on the Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment , Motion to Extend time to file answer. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 and SETTING a Telephonic Status Hearing on said motion, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Status hearing to be held on 1/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
30 30 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Tue 11/14 2:13 PM
Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the hearing held on November 14, 2017 on the Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment , Motion to Extend time to file answer. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 and SETTING a Telephonic Status Hearing on said motion, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Status hearing to be held on 1/4/2018 at 01:30 PM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
29 29 answer Objection Tue 11/07 4:58 PM
Objection to Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 , Motion to Extend time to file answer. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 29, 2017
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Mon 10/30 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Notice of Hearing regarding Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment and Motion to Extend time to file answer23 22 Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 . ANY OBJECTION TO THE MOTION HEREIN SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF HEARING. Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. cc: sl
Friday, October 27, 2017
27 27 notice Hearing(Document) Fri 10/27 1:33 PM
Notice of Hearing regarding Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment and Motion to Extend time to file answer23 22 Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC26 . ANY OBJECTION TO THE MOTION HEREIN SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN SEVEN DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF HEARING. Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. cc: sl (Gudgel, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
26 26 motion Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Thu 10/26 2:47 PM
Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment , Motion to Extend time to file answer Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC (Langdon, Dean)
Related: [-] 23 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant(Related Doc22 ) Entered on 10/13/2017.
Att: 1 Affidavit of Pam Warren
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, October 15, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 10/16 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 10/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant(Related Doc22 ) Entered on 10/13/2017.
Saturday, October 14, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 10/15 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 10/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Power Proz Construction, LLC (related document(s)20 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Power Proz Construction LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley).
Friday, October 13, 2017
23 23 order Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk Fri 10/13 8:40 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendan Related [+] Entered on 10/13/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 22
Thursday, October 12, 2017
22 22 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(1) Thu 10/12 1:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Power Proz Construction LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Default Judgment
21 21 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/12 7:34 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Power Proz Construction, LLC Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 20 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Power Proz Construction LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
20 20 motion Default - Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(a) Wed 10/11 4:17 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Power Proz Construction LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Entry of Default
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
19 19 order Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/30 3:44 PM
Order Denying9 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC for failure to appear and prosecute said motion. Pre-Trial Conference continued to 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME at Telephonic Hearing. Defendant shall have up to and including 9/22/2017 to file an Answer. Entered on 8/30/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
18 18 misc Notice to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/18 12:19 PM
Notice to Withdraw as Attorney. Filed by Power Proz Construction LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kenneth
Thursday, August 17, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Fri 08/18 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 08/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE the Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. ANY PARTY WISHING TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT ONE OF THE VIDEO CONFERENCE SITES IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT MUST CONTACT THE COURT BY PHONE NO LATER THAN TWO BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED HEARING. cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Fri 08/18 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Hearing regarding the First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC9 . Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. ANY PARTY WISHING TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT ONE OF THE VIDEO CONFERENCE SITES IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT MUST CONTACT THE COURT BY PHONE NO LATER THAN TWO BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED HEARING. cc: Parties of Record
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
15 15 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Tue 08/15 7:56 AM
Order of the Court to RESCHEDULE the Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. ANY PARTY WISHING TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT ONE OF THE VIDEO CONFERENCE SITES IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT MUST CONTACT THE COURT BY PHONE NO LATER THAN TWO BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED HEARING. cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Hearing(Document) Tue 08/15 7:51 AM
Notice of Hearing regarding the First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC9 . Hearing scheduled for 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. ANY PARTY WISHING TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT ONE OF THE VIDEO CONFERENCE SITES IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT MUST CONTACT THE COURT BY PHONE NO LATER THAN TWO BUSINESS DAYS PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED HEARING. cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
13 13 answer Objection Mon 08/14 4:45 PM
Objection to First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC9 . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Thu 07/27 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order of the Court to continue the TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for July 27, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Monday, July 24, 2017
11 11 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Mon 07/24 1:42 PM
Order of the Court to continue the TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference presently scheduled for July 27, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03025 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21599988,'Wheatley_v_Power_Proz_Construction_LLC',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
notice Objections Mon 07/24 1:40 PM
Notice for Response to be filed by Plaintiff regarding9 First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC. Response due on or before 8/14/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 07/22 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 PDF Notice Request to K. Reed regarding (related documents- Notice of Deficiency). Notice Date 07/21/2017. (Admin.
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/21 9:26 AM
First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kenneth
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum In Support
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
8 8 notice PDF Notice Request-Selected Parties Wed 07/19 9:32 AM
PDF Notice Request to K. Reed regarding Related [+]
Related: [-] - Notice of Deficiency (Smithson, M
court Notice of Deficiency-Pleading Must Be Refiled Wed 07/19 9:29 AM
Notice of Deficiency regarding Motion to Dismiss. Deficiencies - incorrect event code and no proposed Order attached. Must be corrected by refiling entire document under the AP motion event- Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. A proposed Order must also be filed (as required with all motions). No further action will be taken by the Court unless pleading is refiled. Related [+]. In addition, the attorney failed to set up an email account in ECF. The attorney is required to set up the email account in order to receive electronic notifications in this case. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 7 First Motion to Dismiss Case of Trustee's Adversary Complaint filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
7 7 motion Dismiss Case - Other Tue 07/18 1:49 PM
First Motion to Dismiss Case of Trustee's Adversary Complaint . Filed by Defendant Power Proz Construction LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kenneth
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/18 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kenneth R. Reed . Filed by on behalf of Power Proz Construction LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kenneth
Thursday, June 08, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/08 10:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on Power Proz Construction LLC on June 8, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
4 4 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Fri 06/02 8:21 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Power Proz Construction LLC Answer Due 7/3/2017.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME at Telephonic Hearing. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 vorder Defer Fee - AP Fri 06/02 8:15 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3025 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
2 2 motion Defer Fee Thu 06/01 4:58 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03025 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Power Proz Construction LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/01 4:56 PM
Adversary case 17-03025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Power Proz Construction LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A