Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03027
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2017
Terminated:Jul 13, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
MC Communications LLC
16 Beadle Lane
Asheville, NC 28803
Represented By
MC Communications LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info
Keith J. Larson
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
court Close Case -AP Thu 07/13 10:01 AM
Case Closed. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 07/01 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 06/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc7 ) Entered on 6/28/2017.
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
8 8 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 10:24 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 6/28/2017. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, June 26, 2017
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 06/26 4:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 09, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/09 11:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on MC Communications LLC on June 9, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
5 5 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Mon 06/05 9:32 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on MC Communications LLC Answer Due 7/5/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Mon 06/05 9:32 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING3 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3027 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
3 3 motion Defer Fee Fri 06/02 3:30 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03027 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against MC Communications LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/02 3:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keith J. Larson . Filed by on behalf of Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/02 3:25 PM
Adversary case 17-03027 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against MC Communications LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A