Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03028
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2017
Terminated:Aug 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alpha Telecom LLC
3782 Avengsong Village Circle
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Alpha Telecom LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
misc Certified Copy Request Tue 01/21 3:08 PM
Request For a Certified Copy of document10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk. - Fee Amount $11.The Document(s) will be mailed to the address on record in the ECF system OR to the specific address entered during the docketing of this event. Alternate mailing address (if applicable): . Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk
crditcrd none Tue 01/21 3:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Certified Copy Request 17-03028 jal) [misc,certcopy] ( 11.00). Receipt number 9279621 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Monday, August 14, 2017
court Close Case -AP Mon 08/14 7:36 AM
Case Closed. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 07/31 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant(Related Doc9 ) Entered on 7/28/2017.
Friday, July 28, 2017
10 10 order Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk Fri 07/28 9:32 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendan Related [+] Entered on 7/28/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, July 27, 2017
9 9 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(1) Thu 07/27 2:58 PM
Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Defendants, Alpha Telcom LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Default Judgment
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Thu 07/27 1:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant, Alpha Telecom LLC. (related document(s)6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alpha Telecom LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley).
Monday, July 24, 2017
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 07/24 10:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant, Alpha Telecom LLC. Related [+]. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alpha Telecom LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
utility Entry Mon 07/24 10:17 AM
Entry to filer for future reference. It appears the rule citation for an entry of default was incorrect. Related [+]. No corrective action required. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alpha Telecom LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Thursday, July 20, 2017
6 6 motion Default - Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(a) Thu 07/20 9:58 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Alpha Telecom LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, June 09, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/09 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Alpha Telecom LLC on June 9, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2017
4 4 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Mon 06/05 3:47 PM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Alpha Telecom LLC Answer Due 7/5/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) for Telephonic Hearing. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 vorder Defer Fee - AP Mon 06/05 3:46 PM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3028 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Defer Fee Mon 06/05 3:00 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03028 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Alpha Telecom LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/05 2:57 PM
Adversary case 17-03028 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint To Avoid Preferential Transfers by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Alpha Telecom LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A