Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Feb 01, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gilbert Industries, Inc.
8150 State Highway 14
Sparta, MO 65753
Represented By
Gilbert Industries, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 03, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/03 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/03/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, February 01, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/01 10:32 AM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-5069 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
6 6 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/01 10:31 AM
Order Sustaining Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/31/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/31 2:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 06/08 3:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gilbert Industries, Inc. 6/8/2017 (Davis, Carl)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 06/08 8:34 AM
Summons Issued on Gilbert Industries, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2017, Answer Due 7/10/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
court Fee Deferred Thu 06/08 8:31 AM
Fee Deferred Related [+]. (wed)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05069 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Gilbert Industries, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Wed 06/07 9:48 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis - summons(es) requested on Gilbert Industries, Inc. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/07 9:44 AM
Adversary case 17-05069 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Gilbert Industries, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet