RONNIE VAN ZANT, INC., et al. v. ARTIMUS PYLE (a/k/a THOMAS D. PYLE), et al.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Sweet |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03360 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2017 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
CLEOPATRA FILMS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CLEOPATRA RECORDS, INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Artimus Pyle
103 Kennedy Street
Black Mountain, NC 28711 |
|
Defendant
XYZ CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
XYZ LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Corinna Gaines Biemiller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Houston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONNIE VAN ZANT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Rapp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary R. Rossington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Van Zant
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
86 | 86
misc
Taxation of Costs
Fri 01/25 2:30 PM
TAXATION OF COSTS as to85 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation. Costs are taxed on January 25, 2019, in favor of Cleopatra Records, Inc., and Cleopatra Films against Ronnie Van Zant, Inc., et al., in the amount of $17,036.69. Done on submission, no objections made.(dt) (Main Document 86 replaced on 1/25/2019) (dt) |
|
minutes
Bill of Costs Hearing
Fri 01/25 2:24 PM
Minute Entry Bill of Costs: Done on submission 1/25/2019, no objections filed. (dt) |