Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03033
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2017
Terminated:Feb 01, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Moncom LLC
7001 W. 76th St. Bldg. 5
Overland Park, KS 66204
Represented By
Moncom LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC
615 Commerce St., Ste. 101
Tacoma, WA 98402
Represented By
Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
court Close Case -AP Thu 02/01 7:17 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sat 01/20 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 01/19/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc23 ) Entered on 1/17/2018.
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/17 12:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 1/17/2018. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
23 23 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/16 12:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
court Notice of Required Action Wed 01/03 8:40 AM
Notice of Required Action. Pursuant to the approved settlement agreement, trustee was to "immediately" move for dismissal. If no motion/AO to dismiss is filed by the deadline set below, a status hearing may be set Related [+]. Miscellaneous Deadline 2/2/2018. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 22 Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement (Related Doc19 ) Entered on 12/19/2017.
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
22 22 order Settlement Agreement Tue 12/19 4:01 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement Related [+] Entered on 12/19/2017. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Thu 11/30 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 11/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)19 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley). Objections due by 12/18/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Monday, November 27, 2017
20 20 notice Objections Mon 11/27 12:30 PM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 12/18/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
19 19 motion Approve Settlement Wed 11/22 11:35 AM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03033 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Moncom LLC, Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
18 18 order Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/19 9:23 AM
Order Granting Agreed Scheduling Orde Related [+] Entered on 9/19/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, September 15, 2017
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/15 12:56 PM
Agreed Motion for Scheduling Order. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 09/03 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03033 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21828892,'Wheatley_v_Moncom_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, August 31, 2017
15 15 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 08/31 2:17 PM
Order Granting Motion for Roland Jones To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Entered on 8/31/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 08/31 12:12 PM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03033 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21828892,'Wheatley_v_Moncom_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
13 13 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 08/30 1:52 PM
Motion for Attorney Roland Gary Jones to Appear pro hac vice. District Court Receipt number L33052160. Filed by Defendant Moncom LLC (Boyd, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Att: 2 Exhibit Roland Gary Jones Affidavit
Att: 3 Proposed Order
12 12 misc Document (Generic) Wed 08/30 1:34 PM
Document: Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Moncom LLC (Boyd, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2017
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/28 9:50 AM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Moncom LLC (Meyer, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
10 10 order Continue Hearing Thu 08/17 1:30 PM
Order Granting Related [+] Motion To Continue/Reschedule Pretrial Conference, rescheduled to 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing. Defendant shall up to and including 8/27/2017 to file an answer. Entered on 8/17/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
9 9 motion Continue Hearing Wed 08/16 9:27 AM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-] 3 Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Moncom LLC Answer Due 7/28/2017; Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC Answer Due 7/28/2017.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/17/2017 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing.
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
8 8 misc Document (Generic) Tue 08/08 11:15 AM
Document: Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC. Filed by Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/08 10:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David J. Jencks . Filed by on behalf of Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC (Jencks, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/28 10:09 AM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/30 1:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Moncom LLC, Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC on June 30, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Wed 06/28 3:24 PM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3033 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Wed 06/28 3:23 PM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Moncom LLC Answer Due 7/28/2017; Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC Answer Due 7/28/2017.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/17/2017 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 06/28 2:50 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03033 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Moncom LLC, Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/28 2:46 PM
Adversary case 17-03033 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Moncom LLC, Pinnacle Specialty Capital LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]