Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03034
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2017
Terminated:Mar 19, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oklahoma Tower & Energy Services LLC
10760 N. 166th East Ave.
Owasso, OK 74055
Represented By
Oklahoma Tower & Energy Services LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sunbelt Finance LLC
2900 Browns Lane
Jonesboro, AR 72401
Represented By
Sunbelt Finance LLC
contact info
Defendant
DB Squared Inc.
6767 West Tropicana Ave., Ste. 299
Las Vegas, NV 89103
Represented By
DB Squared Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2018
Memorandum and Order Granting the Trustee's 26 Motion For Summary Judgment Against Oklahoma Tower & Energy LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley. Entered on 1/23/2018 (Pierce, M)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]