Gibson v. Gander Mountain Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30673
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30673
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Ridgway |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03084 |
Nature of Suit | 65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gander Mountain Company
180 East 5th Street, Suite 1300
Saint Paul, MN 55101 |
|
Plaintiff
David Joel Gibson
10213 Bridgewater Drive
Theodore, AL 36582 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
court
MNB Close adversary case
Fri 07/28 2:34 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-3084 closed. (Susan MNBM) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 07/21 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 07/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
MNB Order dismissing adversary proceeding
Wed 07/19 7:27 AM
Order dismissing adversary proceeding without prejudice. Ridgway,J.:7/19/2017) (Michael MNBM) |
|
utility
MNB Disposition of adversary
Wed 07/19 7:29 AM
Disposition of adversary 3:17-ap-3084. Disposition: Dismissing Complaint. (Michael MNBM) |
||
Sunday, July 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/02 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 07/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
MNB Clerk notice of fees due
Fri 06/30 12:26 PM
Clerk's notice of fees due. Amount due: 350.00. (Carrie MNBM) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
MNB Complaint (fee)
Fri 06/30 12:25 PM
Adversary case 17-03084 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (65 (Dischargeability - other)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by David Joel Gibson against Gander Mountain Company . Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Carrie MNBM) |