Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11800

New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert H Jacobvitz
Case #: 1:17-ap-01051
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2017
Terminated:Apr 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Timothy Delgado
Represented By
Timothy Delgado
contact info
Defendant
Stacey Delgado
Represented By
Stacey Delgado
contact info
Defendant
Pat Mataya
Represented By
Pat Mataya
contact info
Defendant
Mataya Construction Co. Inc
Represented By
Mataya Construction Co. Inc
contact info
Defendant
Gallup Lumber & Supply Co
Represented By
Gallup Lumber & Supply Co
contact info
Defendant
Red Mesa Electric Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Red Mesa Electric Enterprises LLC
contact info
Defendant
Elkhorn Cabinets LLC
Represented By
Elkhorn Cabinets LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rehoboth Christian School
Represented By
Rehoboth Christian School
contact info
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onemain Financial F/K/A Citifinancial
Represented By
Onemain Financial F/K/A Citifinancial
contact info
Defendant
First Financial Credit Union
Represented By
First Financial Credit Union
contact info
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
Represented By
Synchrony Bank
contact info
Defendant
New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By
New York Life Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Fidelity and Guarantee Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Fidelity and Guarantee Life Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Consumer Claimants' Committee of Quick Cash, Inc
Represented By
Daniel Andrew White
Askew & Mazel, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 13 2018
Memorandum Opinion. (pgh)
GPO Jul 31 2019
Memorandum Opinion (RE: related document(s)66 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Timothy Delgado, Defendant Stacey Delgado, 71 Motion to Extend filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales). (alg)
GPO Aug 27 2020
Opinion (RE: related document(s)9 Amended Complaint). (TKK)
GPO Feb 18 2022
Opinion (RE: related document(s)136 Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant Nael Al-Assi). (CG)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 11, 2022
151 151 misc Stipulation Thu 08/11 3:49 PM
Stipulation by and between Yvette J. Gonzales and Mataya Construction Co., Inc., Pat Mataya, Gallup Lumber and Supply Co., Red Mesa Electric Enterprises LLC, and Rehoboth Christian School as to Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with Prejudice, Filed by Plaintiff Yvette J. Gonzales. (Gatton, Christopher)
Related: [-]