New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert H Jacobvitz
Case #: 1:15-bk-11800
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 07, 2019
Claims Deadline:Dec 23, 2015
Converted:Aug 11, 2017

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Quick Cash, Inc., a New Mexico Corporation
1310 Metro Ave
Gallup, NM 87301-5375
Represented By
Daniel J Behles
Moore, Berkson, Bassan & Behles P.C.
contact info
Debtor
Quick Cash, Inc., a New Mexico corporation
1310 Metro Ave
Gallup, NM 87301-5375
Represented By
Arin Elizabeth Berkson
Moore, Berkson, Bassan & Behles, P.C.
contact info
Daniel J Behles
Moore, Berkson, Bassan & Behles P.C.
contact info
George M Moore
Moore, Bassan & Behles P.C.
contact info
Debtor
Moore Bassan & Behles, PC
3800 Osuna Rd NE, Suite #2
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Unsecured Creditors Committee of Quick Cash, Inc.
10400 Academy NE, Suite 350
Albuquerque, NM 87111
Represented By
Denise J Trujillo
Giddens, Gatton & Jacobus, P.C.
contact info
H Jesse Jacobus, III
Law Office Of George "dave" Giddens, P.C
contact info
Christopher M Gatton
Giddens, Gatton & Jacobus, P.C.
contact info
George D Giddens, Jr
Giddens, Gatton & Jacobus, P.C.
contact info
Creditor Committee
Consumer Claimant's Committee
Represented By
Michael K Daniels
Michael K. Daniels
contact info
James A Askew
Askew & Mazel, LLC
contact info
Daniel A. White
Askew & White, LLC
contact info
Edward Alexander Mazel
Askew & Mazel, LLC
contact info
Michelle Ostrye
Askew & Mazel, LLC
contact info
Jacqueline Ortiz
Sutin Thayer & Browne
contact info
Special Counsel
James E Fitting
2901 Juan Tabo Blvd NE Ste. 100E
Albuquerque, NM 87112
Special Counsel
David R Jordan
Represented By
David R Jordan
contact info
Trustee
Yvette J. Gonzales
Trustee PO Box 1037
Placitas, NM 87043
Represented By
Benjamin A. Jacobs
Gatton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Chris W Pierce
Walker & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Yvette J. Gonzales
Yvette J. Gonzales, LLC
contact info
Thomas D Walker
Walker & Associates, P.C.
contact info
James A Askew
Askew & Mazel, LLC
contact info
Daniel A. White
Askew & White, LLC
contact info
Christopher M Gatton
Giddens, Gatton & Jacobus, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
PO Box 608
Albuquerque, NM 87103
Represented By
Jaime A. Pena
Doj-Ust
contact info
Leonard K Martinez-Metzgar
contact info
Alice Nystel Page
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Nov 10 2015
Memorandum Opinion and Order on Motions to Apply Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7023 to the Claims Allowance and Disallowance Process (RE: related document(s)55 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Committee Consumer Claimant's Committee, 57 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Carolyn Tullie). (pgh)
GPO Oct 30 2017
Default Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay and Abandonment of Property to Firstlease, Inc. (Related Doc # 321) (cmw)

Docket last updated: 02/06/2025 7:55 AM MST
Monday, July 06, 2015
crditcrd none Mon 07/06 8:17 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11800 11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number 3147651, amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge Mon 07/06 2:19 PM
Judge Robert H. Jacobvitz added to case . (mrm)
Related: [-]
court Set Judge Code Flag Mon 07/06 2:34 PM
Set Judge Code Flag to JA (Jacobvitz-Albuquerque) . (mrm)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/06 8:11 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Quick Cash, Inc., a New Mexico Corporation. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity Period ends: 11/3/2015. Disclosure Statement Exclusivity Period ends: 11/3/2015. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule F - Pre-petition payments
Att: 2 Exhibit Schedule F - Disputed customer claims
Att: 3 Exhibit Schedule of litigation
Att: 4 Signature Page Signature page
Att: 5 Signature Page Signature
2 2 motion Employ (Ch 11 First Day Motion) Mon 07/06 9:07 AM
Application to Employ: Moore, Berkson, Bassan & Behles, P.C. as Attorneys for Debtor in Possession Filed by Debtor Quick Cash, Inc., a New Mexico Corporation. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attorney verification
3 3 motion Approval (Motion) Mon 07/06 9:15 AM
Motion for Approval of Agreement for use of cash collateral Filed by Debtor Quick Cash, Inc., a New Mexico Corporation. (Behles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement
Att: 2 Signature Page Signatures
Att: 3 Exhibit Budget
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposed Order
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance (Notice) Mon 07/06 2:21 PM
Notice of Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Leonard K Martinez-Metzgar on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Martinez-Metzgar, Leonard)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance (Notice) Mon 07/06 3:01 PM
Notice of Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by James C Jacobsen on behalf of Creditor Taxation and Revenue Department of the State of New Mexico. (Jacobsen, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 07/06 3:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/6/2015 at 09:30 AM at Albuquerque: 500 Gold Ave SW, Room 12411. (mrm)
Related: [-]