Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03035
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2017
Terminated:Feb 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
CNI Services LLC
SERVE: c/o Jeff Chancellor Managing Member 13924 Bates Aston Rd.
Haslet, TX 76052
Represented By
CNI Services LLC
contact info
Defendant
American Factors Corporation
SERVE: c/o U.E. Whatley President and Registered Agent 2323 Bryan St., Suite 2121
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
American Factors Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2018
court Close Case -AP Mon 02/05 9:49 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/19 3:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 1/19/2018. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
16 16 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/17 11:46 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
15 15 order Settlement Agreement Wed 12/20 1:30 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement with American Factors Corporation. Trustee to file the appropriate document to dismiss party AFC. Related [+] Entered on 12/20/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, November 30, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Fri 12/01 10:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 11/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)12 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley). Objections due by 12/19/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
13 13 notice Objections Tue 11/28 10:16 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 12/19/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Monday, November 27, 2017
12 12 motion Approve Settlement Mon 11/27 4:25 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03035 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against CNI Services LLC, AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 23, 2017
11 11 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial/Trial Mon 10/23 12:53 PM
Order To SET Trial. Trial scheduled on 1/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 10/23/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 09/03 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03035 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21949644,'Wheatley_v_CNI_Services_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, August 31, 2017
9 9 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 08/31 12:10 PM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03035 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21949644,'Wheatley_v_CNI_Services_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/14 4:02 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant CNI Services LLC (Neukomm, Charity)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Document (Generic) Mon 08/14 2:40 PM
Document: Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of American Factors Corporation. Filed by American Factors Corporation (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/14 2:34 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant American Factors Corporation (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/17 5:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on CNI Services LLC of SERVE: c/o Jeff Chancellor on July 17, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
4 4 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Thu 07/13 6:56 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on American Factors Corporation Answer Due 8/14/2017; CNI Services LLC Answer Due 8/14/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) for Telephonic Hearing. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 vorder Defer Fee - AP Thu 07/13 6:55 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3035 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Preston, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 07/12 2:15 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03035 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against CNI Services LLC, AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/12 2:13 PM
Adversary case 17-03035 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against CNI Services LLC, AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]