Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03036
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2017
Terminated:Mar 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dolan Directional Drilling Inc.
SERVE: c/o Michael B. Dolan President and Director 508 W Aurora Vistr Trail
Aurora, TX 76078
Represented By
Dolan Directional Drilling Inc.
contact info
Defendant
American Factors Corporation
SERVE: c/o U.E. Whatley President and Registered Agent 2323 Bryan St., Suite 2121
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
American Factors Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
misc Certified Copy Request Tue 01/21 3:10 PM
Request For a Certified Copy of document22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk. - Fee Amount $11.The Document(s) will be mailed to the address on record in the ECF system OR to the specific address entered during the docketing of this event. Alternate mailing address (if applicable): . Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk
crditcrd none Tue 01/21 3:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Certified Copy Request 17-03036 jal) [misc,certcopy] ( 11.00). Receipt number 9279621 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
court Close Case -AP Wed 03/28 2:13 PM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 28, 2018
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Mon 01/29 10:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 01/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order to Dismiss Party Terminated party: American Factors Corporation (related document(s)24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as to American Factors Corporation filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley,26 Motion to Dismiss Party American Factors Corporation filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley). Entered on 1/26/2018
Friday, January 26, 2018
27 27 order Dismissing Party - Adversary Only Fri 01/26 3:25 PM
Order to Dismiss Party Terminated party: American Factors Corporation Related [+]. Entered on 1/26/2018 (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as to American Factors Corporation filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley,26 Motion to Dismiss Party American Factors Corporation filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
26 26 motion Dismiss Party from Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/24 9:29 AM
Motion to Dismiss Party American Factors Corporation . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 court Notice of Deficiency-Pleading Must Be Refiled Wed 01/24 8:17 AM
Notice of Deficiency regarding Motion to Dismiss as to American Factors Corp. Deficiency - filed using an incorrect event. Must be corrected by refiling entire document using the event Dismiss Party from Adversary Proceeding under the Motions category - if processed as is, when granted, the entire adversary would be dismissed on the record. No further action will be taken by the Court unless pleading is refiled. Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as to American Factors Corporation filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
24 24 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/23 9:47 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as to American Factors Corporation . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, December 30, 2017
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 12/31 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Dolan Directional Drilling(Related Doc21 ) Entered on 12/28/2017.
Thursday, December 28, 2017
22 22 order Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk Thu 12/28 9:02 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Dolan Directional Drillin Related [+] Entered on 12/28/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
21 21 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(1) Wed 12/27 1:41 PM
Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Default Judgment
20 20 misc Withdrawal of Document Wed 12/27 1:40 PM
Withdrawal of Document Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 19 Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
19 19 motion Default Judgment - Entered by the Clerk - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(b)(1) Wed 12/27 1:28 PM
Motion for Default Judgment to be Entered by the Clerk of Court against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Default Judgment
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
18 18 order Settlement Agreement Wed 12/20 1:33 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement with American Factors Corporation. Trustee to tender the appropriate pleading to dismiss AFC. Related [+] Entered on 12/20/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, December 16, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 12/17 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 12/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Clerk's Entry of Default against Dolan Directional Drilling (related document(s)15 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley).
Thursday, December 14, 2017
16 16 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/14 9:02 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Dolan Directional Drilling Related [+]. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 15 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
15 15 motion Default - Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Fed. R. Bank. P. 7055(a) Wed 12/13 4:47 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Dolan Directional Drilling, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Entry of Default
Thursday, November 30, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Fri 12/01 10:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 11/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)11 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley). Objections due by 12/19/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
13 13 notice Objections Tue 11/28 10:19 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 12/19/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Monday, November 27, 2017
12 12 misc Proposed Order Mon 11/27 4:20 PM
Proposed Order RE: Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
11 11 motion Approve Settlement Mon 11/27 4:18 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03036 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Dolan Directional Drilling Inc., AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, October 23, 2017
10 10 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Pre-Trial/Trial Mon 10/23 12:54 PM
Order To Set Trial. Trial scheduled on 1/30/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #1, 5th Fl. (7th St. Elevators), 601 West Broadway, Louisville, KY 40202. Entered on 10/23/2017 (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 09/03 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03036 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21949645,'Wheatley_v_Dolan_Directional_Drilling_Inc_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, August 31, 2017
8 8 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 08/31 12:07 PM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03036 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21949645,'Wheatley_v_Dolan_Directional_Drilling_Inc_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
7 7 misc Document (Generic) Mon 08/14 2:47 PM
Document: Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of American Factors Corporation. Filed by American Factors Corporation (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/14 2:45 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant American Factors Corporation (Waxman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/20 10:43 AM
Summons Service Executed on American Factors Corporation, Dolan Directional Drilling Inc. on July 20, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Thu 07/13 7:32 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3036 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Thu 07/13 7:31 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on American Factors Corporation. Answer Due 8/14/2017; Dolan Directional Drilling Inc. Answer Due 8/14/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
2 2 motion Defer Fee Wed 07/12 2:22 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03036 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Dolan Directional Drilling Inc., AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/12 2:20 PM
Adversary case 17-03036 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against Dolan Directional Drilling Inc., AMERICAN FACTORS CORPORATION. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]