Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03039
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2017
Terminated:Dec 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Triology Tower Services LLC
SERVE: c/o Christopher Mac Shirley Managing Member and Registered Agent 627 Brenna Rd.
Waxahachie, TX 75165
Represented By
Triology Tower Services LLC
contact info
Defendant
Seeds Financial LLC
SERVE: c/o W R Seeds President of Seeds Financial LLC 711 W. Main St., PMB 118
Ovilla, TX 75154
Represented By
Seeds Financial LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E. Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
court Receipt Docket Failure - Fee Paid Tue 07/06 9:06 AM
Filing fee was paid in the amount as indicated in docket text of the previous petition or other document; however, due to an error that was made in the cash register program during the initial receipting, the receipt was not auto-docketed to the case. Fee was paid on 11/12/2020 in the amount of $350.00; Receipt Number is 302493. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
court Close Case -AP Thu 12/14 9:04 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/29 9:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 11/29/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 15
Saturday, November 11, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Sun 11/12 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 11/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice for Objections regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding15 . Objections due by 11/27/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Thursday, November 09, 2017
16 16 notice Objections Thu 11/09 1:42 PM
Notice for Objections regarding Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding15 . Objections due by 11/27/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
15 15 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/08 10:59 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Larson, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 20, 2017
14 14 order Settlement Agreement Fri 10/20 2:45 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement with Seeds Financial Related [+] Entered on 10/20/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, October 13, 2017
13 13 vorder Remanding from the Docket-Hearing Fri 10/13 9:45 AM
Order of the Court REMANDING AND TERMINATING the Pre-Trial Conference held on October 12, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03039 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21979051,'Wheatley_v_Triology_Tower_Services_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Fri 09/29 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 09/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)10 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with Seeds Financial LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley). Objections due by 10/17/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
11 11 notice Objections Tue 09/26 7:39 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 10/17/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with Seeds Financial LLC filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Monday, September 25, 2017
10 10 motion Approve Settlement Mon 09/25 12:08 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with Seeds Financial LLC Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03039 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Triology Tower Services LLC, Seeds Financial LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 07, 2017
9 9 order Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Thu 09/07 1:18 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Seeds Financial to file a responsive pleading Related [+] Entered on 9/7/2017. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
8 8 motion Extend/Shorten/Waive Time Tue 09/05 10:05 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend time to file a responsive pleading. Filed by Defendant Seeds Financial LLC. (Thompson, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 09/03 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03039 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21979051,'Wheatley_v_Triology_Tower_Services_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, August 31, 2017
6 6 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 08/31 12:04 PM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on August 31, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03039 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(21979051,'Wheatley_v_Triology_Tower_Services_LLC_et_al',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 07/20 1:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on Seeds Financial LLC, Triology Tower Services LLC on July 20, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
4 4 vorder Defer Fee - AP Mon 07/17 9:02 AM
Order of the Court GRANTING2 Application to Defer Fee for AP 17-3039 in the amount of $350.00, so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Mon 07/17 9:02 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on Seeds Financial LLC. Answer Due 8/16/2017; Triology Tower Services LLC. Answer Due 8/16/2017. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 8/31/2017 at 10:30 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
2 2 motion Defer Fee Fri 07/14 4:22 PM
Application to Defer Fee for AP Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-03039 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Triology Tower Services LLC, Seeds Financial LLC. filed by Plaintiff Michael E. Wheatley
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/14 4:19 PM
Adversary case 17-03039 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E. Wheatley against Triology Tower Services LLC, Seeds Financial LLC. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]