Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia M Kendall
Case #: 1:14-cv-00066
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2014
Last checked: Friday Dec 05, 2014 8:06 PM CST
Defendant
Dr. Dimitri Azar
Represented By
Tracy Bradford Farley
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Adrianne Clarise Mazura
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Defendant
Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois
Represented By
Tracy Bradford Farley
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Adrianne Clarise Mazura
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Christopher Gondi
Represented By
Tracy Bradford Farley
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Patrick J. Rocks, Jr.
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Sarah Rusch
Represented By
Tracy Bradford Farley
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Adrianne Clarise Mazura
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Jasti Rao
Represented By
Jason Lee Alexander
Law Offices Of Ruth I Major, PC
contact info
Ruth Irene Major
The Law Offices Of Ruth I. Major, PC
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2014
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Counts III and IV are dismissed with prejudice and Counts V and VI are dismissed without prejudice. The Court denies the defendants' motion with respect to Counts VII and VIII. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/23/2014. Mailed notice(ntf, )
GPO Dec 30 2016
Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated therein, the Court denies Rusch and Azars motion to dismiss Counts IX and X. (Dkt. No. 100.) Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/30/2015.Mailed notice(tsa, )
GPO Oct 20 2016
ORDER: For the reasons discussed below, the Court orders as follows: 1) Ms. Siva Jasti must produce all documents requested in Defendants' third party subpoena on or before October 24, 2016; and 2) Defendants must produce the two investigative files of ethics investigations that were referred to outside counsel on or before October 24, 2016. [For further details see order] - Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 10/20/2016. Mailed notice (np, )

Docket last updated: 01/24/2015 7:27 PM CST
Monday, January 06, 2014
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (daj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jasti Rao; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9075149.(Major, Ruth)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Major, Ruth)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jasti Rao by Ruth Irene Major (Major, Ruth)
Related: [-]