Original Case: 1:14-cv-00066

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-02584
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2017
Terminated:Mar 19, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 20, 2018 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
SARAH RUSCH, an individual
Represented By
Adrianne C. Mazura
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DIMITRI AZAR, an individual
Represented By
Tracy L. Farley
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Adrianne C. Mazura
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, an Illinois Public Corporation
Represented By
Tracy L. Farley
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Adrianne C. Mazura
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SARA RUSCH, an individual
Represented By
Tracy L. Farley
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Adrianne C. Mazura
QUARLES & BRADY LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JASTI RAO, Doctor
Represented By
Ruth I. Major
LAW OFFICES OF RUTH I. MAJOR, PC
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2018
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge and Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge. [6911557-1] [6911557] [17-2584]

Docket last updated: 03/20/2018 3:27 AM CDT
Monday, August 07, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jasti Rao by 08/11/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 08/21/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/18/2017 for Jasti Rao. [1] [6859425] 17-2584 (ER)
Related: [-]