New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:13-cv-09195
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2013
Re-opened:Dec 15, 2017
Terminated:Feb 27, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Dec 25, 2014 8:56 PM EST
Defendant
Banca UBAE SpA
Represented By
Ugo Alfredo Colella
Thompson Hine Llp(dc)
contact info
John J. Zefutie, JR.,
Thompson Hine Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bank Markazi
Represented By
Donald F. Luke
Jaffe & Asher LLP
contact info
Eli Joshua Kirschner
Jaffe & Asher LLP
contact info
Bension Daniel De Funis
Jaffe & Asher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Clearstream Banking, S.A.
Represented By
Jonathan David Martin
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Jennifer Gillian Newstead
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Frank Panopoulos
White & Case Llp (dc)
contact info
Gerald Michael Moody
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Islamic Republic of Iran
Garnishee
JP Morgan Chase, NA
270 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Feit
Levi Lubarsky & Feigenbaum LLP
contact info
Steven B. Feigenbaum
Levi Lubarsky & Feigenbaum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah D. Peterson
Represented By
James Patrick Bonner
Stone Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan M. Davies
Stone Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Mark Nathan Antar
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman Broudyllp
contact info
Patrick Louis Rocco
Stone Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman Broudyllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
361 361 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 02/28 9:42 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to345 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Bank Markazi,335 Notice of Appeal, filed by Clearstream Banking, S.A.,188 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Banca UBAE SpA,321 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Bank Markazi. USCA Case Number 15-690(L), 23-614(Con), 23-700(Con). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the district court's order and judgment are AFFIRMED in part and VACATED in part, and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Courts opinion.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/27/2025..(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinion,
Att: 2 Concurring Opinion
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Fri 02/28 9:44 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:361 USCA Mandate,,..(nd)
Related: [-]