Original Case: 1:13-cv-09195

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00700
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 14, 2024 4:39 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Clearstream Banking, S.A.
Represented By
Corey M. Meyer
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Craig Cagney
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Paul Callahan
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Bryan Earle
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Timothy Dunnigan
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rick Crudale
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kevin Coulman
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Nathaniel Dorsey
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Russell Cyzick
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
John W. Blocker
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jolumy Len Copeland
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Charles Dennis Cook
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael Devlin
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Robert Allen Conley
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Johnnie Ceasar
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Bradley Campus
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mecot Camara
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Deborah D. Peterson, personal representative of the Estate of James C. Knipple
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
William Burley
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Norman Boyett
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jeffrey Joseph Boulos
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Bonk, Jr.
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Leon Bohannon
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joseph John Boccia, Jr.
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
David Cosner
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard D. Blankenship
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alvin Burton Belmer
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jess W. Beamon
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
James Baynard
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ronny Kent Bates
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Robert Allman
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Terry Abbott
Represented By
James P. Bonner
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Susan Marlene Davies
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Patrick Rocco
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman & Broudy LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 13 2024
OPINION, the district court’s order and judgment are affirmed in part and vacated in part and remanded for further proceedings, by RDS, BDP, RJL, FILED.[3636919] [15-690, 23-614, 23-700]
GPO Nov 13 2024
OPINION, Concurring, by RJL, FILED.[3636920] [15-690, 23-614, 23-700]

Docket last updated: 11/14/2024 4:38 AM EST
Friday, April 21, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Clearstream Banking, S.A. in 23-700, FILED. [3507396] [23-700, 23-614] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:30 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 566 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/22/2023, RECEIVED.[3507398] [23-700] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:33 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Clearstream Banking, S.A., district court receipt # ANYSDC-27638327, FILED.[3507399] [23-700] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:34 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3507400] [23-700] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:34 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 566 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 NOTE: See lead case, 23-614, containing complete set of docket entries.[3507402] [23-700] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:40 PM]
Related: [-]