Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12329

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:17-ap-01098
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2017
Terminated:Jan 16, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Airgas, Inc.
Represented By
Airgas, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Airgas Safety, Inc.
Represented By
Airgas Safety, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
James S. Feltman, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 11 Trustee of the Estate of Corporate Resource Services, Inc., et al.,
Represented By
Steven S. Flores
Togut, Segal & Segal, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
9 9 order Order, Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/16 1:36 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/16/2018 Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/16 1:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1098 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
8 8 notice Notice, Hearing Tue 12/12 12:39 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of December 13, 2017 Pretrial Conference Related [+] filed by Steven S. Flores on behalf of James S. Feltman. (Flores, Steven)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, October 26, 2017
7 7 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 10/26 5:04 PM
Second Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer and Scheduling the Pretrial Conference Date signed on 10/26/2017. The date for the Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until December 11, 2017. Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 12/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG). (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/26 11:23 AM
First Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer and Scheduling the Pretrial Conference Date Signed on 9/26/2017. Hearing to be held on 10/31/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2017
5 5 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 08/28 2:41 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference Related [+] filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, August 25, 2017
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 08/25 4:23 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Adjourned Conference Date: 9/28/17 @ 11:00 a.m.) Notice of Adjournment of Pretrial Conference filed by Steven S. Flores on behalf of James S. Feltman. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG) (Flores, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/15 2:20 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Bar Date Served on July 25, 2017 Related [+] filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 07/25 9:05 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/29/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 8/24/2017, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 07/21 1:11 PM
Adversary case 17-01098 Complaint against Airgas, Inc., Airgas Safety, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven S. Flores on behalf of James S. Feltman. (Flores, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B