Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11546

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:15-bk-12329
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2015
Terminated:Feb 27, 2023

Debtor
Corporate Resource Services, Inc.
160 Broadway Fl 13
New York, NY 10038-4201
Represented By
Ronald S Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014

GPO Feb 28 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order After Trial signed on 2/28/2019. (Gomez, Jessica)
GPO Oct 10 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 10/10/2019, Denying Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement. (related document(s)979, 978, 965, 977, 986) (Anderson, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
1291 1291 misc Notice of Returned Mail Tue 03/07 4:32 PM
Notice of Returned Mail Related [+] (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-] 1286